Reports for Swiss CRM Institute AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Swiss CRM Institute AG
- Swiss CRM Institute AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Inwil. Swiss CRM Institute AG belongs to the industry «Other Business-to-Business services» and is currently active.
- The management of the company Swiss CRM Institute AG consists of 3 persons.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 24.03.2021. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Swiss CRM Institute AG is the following: CHE-102.702.415.
- COPE AG, Empowerment Group GmbH, Marcel Gurtner Holding AG are registered at the same address.
Management (3)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Manuel Isenschmid,
Sandra Dorothea Maria Schlauss,
Stephan Niklaus Isenschmid
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
07.02.1997
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Inwil
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.019.693-6
UID/VAT
CHE-102.702.415
Sector
Other Business-to-Business services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Förderung und den Unterhalt eines Wirtschafts-Netzwerks in der Schweiz. Die Beratung und das Coaching von Organisationen, Unternehmen und Einzelpersonen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Ferner kann Sie im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten, Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Auditrium AG | Stans | 30.01.2009 | 20.05.2010 | |
Translex AG | Cham | 06.06.2007 | 29.01.2009 | |
Lufida Revisions AG | Luzern | <2004 | 05.06.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Outline Software AG
- Outline AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Swiss CRM Institute AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005131978, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Swiss CRM Institute AG, bisher in Zürich, CHE-102.702.415, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 114 vom 17.06.2013, Publ. 919937).
Statutenänderung:
17.12.2020.
Sitz neu:
Inwil.
Domizil neu:
Industriestrasse 1, 6034 Inwil.
Publication number: HR02-1005131868, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Swiss CRM Institute AG, in Zürich, CHE-102.702.415, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 114 vom 17.06.2013, S.0, Publ. 919937). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Inwil im Handelsregister des Kantons Luzern eingetragen und im Handelsregisteramt des Kantons Zürich von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Publication number: 919937, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Swiss CRM Institute AG, in Zürich, CH-100.3.019.693-6, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 221 vom 13.11.2012, Publ. 6928420).
Domizil neu:
Zollikerstrasse 153, 8008 Zürich.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Oggenfuss, Christoph, von Rudolfstetten-Friedlisberg, in Erlenbach ZH, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Isenschmid, Stephan, von Alberswil und Luzern, in Ballwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.