Address
c/o Fival SA
Chemin du Flonzel 59
1093 La Conversion
Reports for Swiss Carriers SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Swiss Carriers SA
- Swiss Carriers SA is currently active and the industry «Other transportation services». The legal headquarters are in La Conversion.
- The company was founded on 02.09.2008 and has one person in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 22.04.2020.
- The company's UID is CHE-114.481.215.
- Next to the company Swiss Carriers SA there are 17 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Akylor SA, DEL-Capital SA, District construction Sàrl.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
02.09.2008
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Lutry
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.055.487-9
UID/VAT
CHE-114.481.215
Sector
Other transportation services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Toute activité commerciale et financière sur le plan international dans le domaine du commerce maritime, développée à partir de la Suisse. Elle est engagée principalement dans l'exploitation générale de navires appartenant à des tiers, leur achat, vente et affrètement dans le cadre de l'opération de lignes maritimes de navigation, dans l'opération d'agences maritimes et en général toute autre opération maritime légale en Suisse ou à l'étranger.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Swiss Carriers SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004875437, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Swiss Carriers SA, à Pully, CHE-114.481.215 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Statuts modifiés le 9 avril 2020. Siège transféré à Lutry.
Nouvelle adresse:
Chemin du Flonzel 59, c/o Fival SA, 1093 La Conversion. Les 100 actions au porteur de CHF 1'000 formant la totalité du capital-actions sont converties en 100 actions nominatives de CHF 1'000, avec restrictions quant à la transmissibilité selon statuts.
Nouvelles formes des communications aux actionnaires:
par écrit ou par courriel. Bonvin Pierre est maintenant de Crans-Montana.
Publication number: 6165218, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Swiss Carriers SA, à Pully, CH-550-1055487-9, toute activité commerciale et financière sur le plan international dans le domaine du commerce maritime, développée à partir de la Suisse (FOSC du 11.05.2011, p. 0/6157516).
Rectificatif:
Bonvin Pierre (et non Bovin Bonvin comme publié) est administrateur.
Publication number: 6157516, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Swiss Carriers SA, à Montreux, CH-550-1055487-9, toute activité commerciale et financière sur le plan international dans le domaine du commerce maritime (FOSC du 15.04.2011, p. 0/6124282). Statuts modifiés le 28 avril 2011. Siège transféré à Pully.
Nouvelle adresse:
avenue Charles-Ferdinand-Ramuz 60, c/o Fival SA, 1009 Pully.
Nouvel administrateur avec signature individuelle:
Bovin Bonvin, de Chermignon, à Lutry.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.