Reports for Sunshine Kinderkrippen AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Sunshine Kinderkrippen AG
- Sunshine Kinderkrippen AG has its legal headquarters in Zürich and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Other social services».
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 05.12.2012.
- On the 20.06.2023 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-279.736.728.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.12.2012
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.038.589-3
UID/VAT
CHE-279.736.728
CHE-337.437.249 VAT
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Gründung und den Betrieb von Kindertagesstätten und vorschulischen Einrichtungen. Sie kann andere Unternehmen gründen, Beteiligungen erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie Geschäfte aller Art betreiben, die bestimmt oder geeignet sind, das Unternehmen zu entwickeln oder den Gesellschaftszweck zu fördern. Dazu gehört auch der Erwerb sowie die Belastung und Veräusserung von Liegenschaften. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Reviduna Revisions AG | Volketswil | 20.06.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Sunshine Kinderkrippen AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005772474, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Sunshine Kinderkrippen AG, in Zürich, CHE-279.736.728, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 204 vom 20.10.2022, Publ. 1005587161).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Reviduna Revisions AG (CHE-108.560.013), in Volketswil, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005587161, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Sunshine Kinderkrippen AG, in Zürich, CHE-279.736.728, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 240 vom 10.12.2012, S.0, Publ. 6966560).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ortuño Sapalski Meili, Ana Belen, spanische Staatsangehörige, in Zürich, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Meili, Yves Emanuel, von Weisslingen, in Zollikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Brugger, Urs, von Cham, in Steinhausen, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 6966560, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Sunshine Kinderkrippen AG, in Zürich, CH-020.3.038.589-3, Titlisstrasse 39, 8032 Zürich, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
19.11.2012.
Zweck:
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Gründung und den Betrieb von Kindertagesstätten und vorschulischen Einrichtungen. Sie kann andere Unternehmen gründen, Beteiligungen erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie Geschäfte aller Art betreiben, die bestimmt oder geeignet sind, das Unternehmen zu entwickeln oder den Gesellschaftszweck zu fördern. Dazu gehört auch der Erwerb sowie die Belastung und Veräusserung von Liegenschaften. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen..
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.00.
Aktien:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch Brief an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen.
Vinkulierung:
Die Übertragbarkeit der Namenaktien ist nach Massgabe der Statuten beschränkt. Gemäss Erklärung vom 19.11.2012 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Eingetragene Personen:
Ortuño Sapalski Meili, Ana Belen, spanische Staatsangehörige, in Zürich, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Meili, Yves Emanuel, von Weisslingen, in Zollikon, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.