Reports for SUNAND AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SUNAND AG
- SUNAND AG from Embrach operates in the sector «IT services» and is active.
- The company was founded on 27.09.1995 and has one person in its management.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 08.06.2015. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-108.382.674.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.09.1995
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Embrach
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.006.524-3
UID/VAT
CHE-108.382.674
Sector
IT services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Entwicklung von Computer-Software im In- und Ausland und die Erbringung aller Dienstleistungen in diesem Zusammenhang, namentlich die Nachbetreuung von Kunden. Die Gesellschaft kann Software-Fachleute an Drittfirmen vermitteln. Die Gesellschaft kann ferner Gaststätten, Garküchen und Traiteur-Geschäfte im In- und Ausland errichten, betreiben und sämtliche damit verbundenen Dienstleistungen anbieten und Geschäfte tätigen. Die Firma kann Waren aller Art importieren und exportieren. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- SUNAND Inc
- SUNAND SA
- SUNAND Ltd
- Sunand AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SUNAND AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 2192187, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
SUNAND AG, in Embrach, CHE-108.382.674, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 73 vom 17.04.2015, Publ. 2103249).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Chinna Reddy Gari, Sudha Venkata Konda Reddy, von Embrach, in Embrach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 2103249, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
SUNAND AG, in Embrach, CHE-108.382.674, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 93 vom 13.05.2011, Publ. 6161524).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kunz, Urs, von Bäretswil, in Bassersdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 6161524, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
SUNAND AG, in Embrach, CH-020.3.006.524-3, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 94 vom 18.05.2010, S. 32, Publ. 5635478).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Chinna Reddy Gari, Konda Reddy Sudha Venkata, indischer Staatsangehöriger, in Embrach, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kunz, Urs, von Bäretswil, in Bassersdorf, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.