Reports for SUBOENO SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SUBOENO SA
- SUBOENO SA is active in the industry «Production and processing of wooden goods» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in St-Prex.
- The management of the company SUBOENO SA, which was founded on the 10.02.2005, consists of 4 persons.
- The last commercial register change was made on 19.07.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The company's UID is CHE-112.228.585.
Management (4)
newest board members
Hugues Roch,
António Rios de Amorim,
Christophe René Fouquet,
Vanessa Marion Druz
newest authorized signatories
Hugues Roch,
António Rios de Amorim,
Christophe René Fouquet,
Vanessa Marion Druz
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.02.2005
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Saint-Prex
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.1.043.139-8
UID/VAT
CHE-112.228.585
Sector
Production and processing of wooden goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Fabrication et commercialisation de bouchons, de produits oenologiques ainsi que d'articles de cave; prise de participations.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduconsult Lausanne SA | Lausanne | 26.01.2017 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire Favre Révision SA | Lausanne | 01.09.2014 | 25.01.2017 | |
BDO SA | Epalinges | 11.03.2011 | 31.08.2014 | |
Dini & Associés SA | Martigny | 16.02.2005 | 10.03.2011 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SUBOENO SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006089658, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
SUBOENO SA, à Saint-Prex, CHE-112.228.585 (FOSC du 23.01.2024, p. 0/1005941899).
Nouvelle adresse:
Chemin du Glapin 10, 1162 St-Prex.
Publication number: HR02-1005941899, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
SUBOENO SA, à Saint-Prex, CHE-112.228.585 (FOSC du 30.11.2023, p. 0/1005898048). Druz Vanessa, qui n'est plus présidente, est nommée déléguée. Rios de Amorim António, de Portugal, à Porto (Portugal), président, avec signature collective à deux, Roch Hugues, de Port-Valais, à Sion, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux, et Fouquet Christophe René, de France, à Porto (Portugal), avec signature collective à deux, sont membres du conseil d'administration.
Publication number: HR02-1005898048, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
SUBOENO SA, à Saint-Prex, CHE-112.228.585 (FOSC du 12.07.2023, p. 0/1005793952). Lüscher Christian n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.