Reports for Studio Arte AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Studio Arte AG
- Studio Arte AG with its legal headquarters in Zürich is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Production and processing of wooden goods». Studio Arte AG is active.
- Studio Arte AG has 3 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 20.06.2023.
- Studio Arte AG is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-108.161.481.
- Companies with an identical address: Cubotoo AG, Dahme Immobilien AG, Donau Immobilien AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
16.12.1994
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.005.588-0
UID/VAT
CHE-108.161.481
Sector
Production and processing of wooden goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Betrieb eines Kunststudios, insbesondere Anfertigung von und Handel mit Einrahmungen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Swissrevi AG | Kreuzlingen | 01.11.2019 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
KGS Treuhand + Consulting AG | Zürich | 18.04.2016 | 31.10.2019 | |
Beratungs-Treuhand-Weissen AG | Zug | 05.12.2008 | 17.04.2016 | |
Beratungstreuhand J.R. Engeler | Steinhausen | <2004 | 04.12.2008 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Studio Arte Flückiger & Fischbach AG
- Studio Arte Flückiger AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Studio Arte AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005772472, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Studio Arte AG, in Zürich, CHE-108.161.481, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 106 vom 04.06.2021, Publ. 1005206511).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmidli, Ken, von Schwarzenberg, in Zürich, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005206511, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Studio Arte Flückiger AG, in Zürich, CHE-108.161.481, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 212 vom 01.11.2019, Publ. 1004750026).
Statutenänderung:
30.04.2021. 26.05.2021.
Firma neu:
Studio Arte AG.
Aktien neu:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 100 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre erfolgen per Brief, E-Mail oder Telefax an die im Aktienbuch verzeichneten Adressen. Die Inhaberaktien sind am 01.05.2021 von Gesetzes wegen in Namenaktien umgewandelt worden. Mit Beschluss der Generalversammlung vom 26.05.2021 wurden die Statuten der Gesellschaft an die Umwandlung angepasst.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Flückiger-Weber, Beatrix, von Rohrbachgraben und Wettswil am Albis, in Bonstetten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Flückiger, Christoph Markus, von Rohrbachgraben, in Bonstetten, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Bickel, Brigitta, von Donneloye, in Horgen, mit Einzelprokura.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.