Reports for Stuber Team AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stuber Team AG
- Stuber Team AG has its legal headquarters in Rotkreuz and is active. It is a Company limited by shares (AG) and active in the industry «Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)».
- The management of the company Stuber Team AG consists of 5 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 23.05.1989.
- The last commercial register change was made on 23.04.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Stuber Team AG is the following: CHE-105.967.200.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Patrik Barmettler,
Gerhard Stuber,
Simone Stuber,
Ivo Notz,
Xaver Schuler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.05.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Risch
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.014.659-1
UID/VAT
CHE-105.967.200
Sector
Other building work (incl. Interior finishing)
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb einer Schreinerei, Küchenbau sowie Handel mit Möbeln; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhand Amstalden GmbH | Neuenkirch | 27.03.2015 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhandbüro Hans Amstalden | Neuenkirch | <2004 | 26.03.2015 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stuber Otto AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stuber Team AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006015485, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Stuber Team AG, in Risch, CHE-105.967.200, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 135 vom 15.07.2020, Publ. 1004937438).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Barmettler, Patrik, von Buochs, in Zug, Prokurist, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004937438, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Stuber Team AG, in Risch, CHE-105.967.200, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 60 vom 27.03.2015, S.0, Publ. 2068357).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stuber, Roger, von Risch, in Meierskappel, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stuber, Gerhard, von Risch, in Risch, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Stuber, Simone, von Risch, in Risch, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Notz, Ivo, von Dagmersellen, in Hünenberg, Prokurist, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Schuler, Xaver, von Rothenthurm, in Schwyz, Prokurist, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: 2068357, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
Stuber Team AG, in Risch, CHE-105.967.200, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 130 vom 06.07.2012, Publ. 6756952).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Treuhandbüro Hans Amstalden, in Neuenkirch, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Treuhand Amstalden GmbH (CHE-208.064.996), in Neuenkirch, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.