Reports for Stocker Stahl AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stocker Stahl AG
- Stocker Stahl AG with its legal headquarters in Rothenburg is active. Stocker Stahl AG operates in the sector «Trading with various goods».
- Stocker Stahl AG was founded on 28.12.1988.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 06.05.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Stocker Stahl AG is the following: CHE-101.518.984.
- On the same address there are 9 other active companies registered. These include: dynamic REAL ESTATE AG, Gut AG, NGI New Generation Investment AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Nicolo Alberto Portmann,
Martin Johannes Kälin,
Raphael Stocker,
Tobias Tresch,
Alfred Stocker
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.12.1988
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Rothenburg
Commercial Registry Office
LU
Commercial register number
CH-100.3.011.880-9
UID/VAT
CHE-101.518.984
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit Stahl und Stahlprodukten sowie allen einschlägigen Produkten des Baugewerbes und des Baunebengewerbes; Beteiligungen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
contrust finance ag | Luzern | 04.01.2012 | 24.06.2012 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stocker Stahl AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006025408, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Stocker Stahl AG, in Rothenburg, CHE-101.518.984, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 19 vom 29.01.2024, Publ. 1005946191).
Domizil neu:
Station-West 2a, 6023 Rothenburg.
Publication number: HR02-1005946191, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Stocker Stahl AG, in Rothenburg, CHE-101.518.984, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 6 vom 11.01.2021, Publ. 1005070047).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Portmann, Nicolo Alberto, von Zuchwil, in Hägendorf, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
contrust finance ag (CHE-106.843.345), in Luzern, Revisionsstelle [bisher: contrust finance ag (CH-100.9.024.497-2)].
Publication number: HR02-1005070047, Commercial Registry Office Lucerne, (100)
Stocker Stahl AG, in Rothenburg, CHE-101.518.984, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 2 vom 04.01.2012, S.0, Publ. 6488436).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Imfeld, Walter, von Sarnen, in Malters, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kälin, Martin Johannes, von Einsiedeln, in Risch, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.