Reports for StillPoint Zürich GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout StillPoint Zürich GmbH
- StillPoint Zürich GmbH has its legal headquarters in Zürich and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Services regarding management consulting».
- StillPoint Zürich GmbH has 3 persons entered in its management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 08.09.2021.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-296.643.016.
- On the same address as StillPoint Zürich GmbH there are 43 other active companies registered. These include: Arcus Capital AG, Baloo AG, Bellis Immobilien AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.04.2013
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.4.049.800-4
UID/VAT
CHE-296.643.016
Sector
Services regarding management consulting
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Organisation und den Betrieb eines internationalen Beratungszentrums. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- StillPoint Zürich LLC
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: StillPoint Zürich GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005286647, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
StillPoint Zürich GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-296.643.016, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 192 vom 04.10.2019, Publ. 1004730142).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
PrairieCare, LLC, in Brooklyn Park (MN) (US), Gesellschafterin, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
STEPHEN R. SETTERBERG, M.D., LTD. (48588), in Minneapolis (MN) (US), Gesellschafterin, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Publication number: HR02-1004730142, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
StillPoint Zürich GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-296.643.016, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 33 vom 18.02.2019, Publ. 1004568386).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Tsempelis, Evangelos, griechischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 40 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
PrairieCare, LLC, in Brooklyn Park (MN) (US), Gesellschafterin, mit 200 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: mit 160 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00].
Publication number: HR02-1004568386, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
StillPoint Zürich GmbH, in Zürich, CHE-296.643.016, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 73 vom 17.04.2018, Publ. 4174899).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Tsempelis, Evangelos, griechischer Staatsangehöriger, in Zürich, Gesellschafter, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit 40 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 100.00 [bisher: Gesellschafter und Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Demiri, Jetmir, von Zürich, in Zürich, Vorsitzender der Geschäftsführung, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Setterberg, Stephen, amerikanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Lugano, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift, [bisher: ohne eingetragene Funktion, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.