Address
c/o Apothekerverband des Kantons Bern
Münzgraben 6
3011 Bern
Reports for Stiftung zur Förderung des pharmazeutischen Nachwuchses
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung zur Förderung des pharmazeutischen Nachwuchses
- Stiftung zur Förderung des pharmazeutischen Nachwuchses has its legal headquarters in Bern, is active and operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The organization was founded on 18.11.1961.
- On the 05.06.2023 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-104.057.330.
- Companies with the same address as Stiftung zur Förderung des pharmazeutischen Nachwuchses: Apothekerverband des Kantons Bern, BISCOSUISSE, CHOCOSUISSE, Verband Schweizerischer Schokoladefabrikanten Genossenschaft.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Prof. Dr. Verena Schröder,
Mark Adrian Kobel,
Daniel Wechsler
newest authorized signatories
Prof. Dr. Verena Schröder,
Mark Adrian Kobel,
Daniel Wechsler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.11.1961
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.7.003.325-1
UID/VAT
CHE-104.057.330
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt die Vorbereitung und Förderung für die praktische Ausübung ihres Berufes von Studierenden der Pharmazie aus dem Kanton Bern durch Vermittlung von Wissensgebieten, welche ausserhalb des Studienplans liegen (Homöopathie, Rechtskunde, Betriebswirtschaftslehre, Buchhaltung, etc.).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Siegenthaler Revision AG | Ittigen | 26.10.2012 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung zur Förderung des pharmazeutischen Nachwuchses an der Universität Bern
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung zur Förderung des pharmazeutischen Nachwuchses
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005759846, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung zur Förderung des pharmazeutischen Nachwuchses, in Bern, CHE-104.057.330, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 15 vom 23.01.2018, Publ. 4007901).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brenneisen, Rudolf Prof. Dr., von Basel, in Bern, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schröder, Verena Prof. Dr., von Buttisholz, in Toffen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 4007901, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung zur Förderung des pharmazeutischen Nachwuchses, in Bern, CHE-104.057.330, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 61 vom 28.03.2017, Publ. 3429579).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Durtschi, Peter, von Spiez, in Evilard, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kobel, Mark, von Lützelflüh, in Mittelhäusern (Köniz), Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 3429579, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung zur Förderung des pharmazeutischen Nachwuchses, in Bern, CHE-104.057.330, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 209 vom 26.10.2012, Publ. 6905528).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bordoni, Michele, von Lugano, in Innerberg (Wohlen bei Bern), Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Petri, László, von Bern, in Melchenbühl (Muri bei Bern), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Durtschi, Peter, von Spiez, in Evilard, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Wechsler, Daniel Dr., von Willisau, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Siegenthaler Revision AG (CHE-111.733.828), in Köniz, Revisionsstelle [bisher: Siegenthaler Revision AG].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.