Reports for Stiftung 'Zinnfigurensammlung Alfred R. Sulzer'
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung 'Zinnfigurensammlung Alfred R. Sulzer'
- Stiftung 'Zinnfigurensammlung Alfred R. Sulzer' is currently active and the industry «Operation of libraries and museums». The legal headquarters are in Malans GR.
- The management of the organization Stiftung 'Zinnfigurensammlung Alfred R. Sulzer', which was founded on the 22.11.2007, consists of 4 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 21.06.2023.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of GR under the UID CHE-113.942.946.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Ignacio Czeguhn,
Dr. Dr. Thomas Othmar Sprecher,
Alfred Robert Sulzer
newest authorized signatories
Ignacio Czeguhn,
Dr. Dr. Thomas Othmar Sprecher,
Alfred Robert Sulzer
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.11.2007
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Malans
Commercial Registry Office
GR
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.001.470-2
UID/VAT
CHE-113.942.946
Sector
Operation of libraries and museums
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt den Erwerb, die Betreuung und den Ausbau einer Sammlung von Spielzeugfiguren aus Zinn, Blei, Papier, Holz und Papiermaché, hergestellt im Zeitraum von ca. 1750-1900. Die Sammlung oder Teile davon sollen der Öffentlichkeit zugänglich gemacht werden. Die Stiftung ist insbesondere ermächtigt, Leihgaben an Museen im In- und Ausland zu tätigen. Im Weiteren soll die Stiftung Publikationen auf dem Gebiet der europäischen Spielzeugfigur des 18. und 19. Jahrhunderts fördern. Die Stiftung verfolgt weder Erwerbs- noch Selbsthilfezwecke.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Lienhard Audit AG | Zürich | 29.06.2016 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Acton Revisions AG | Zug | 07.10.2013 | 28.06.2016 | |
Linfield Trust Company AG | Zürich | 28.11.2007 | 06.10.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung 'Zinnfigurensammlung Alfred R. Sulzer'
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005774246, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden
Stiftung "Zinnfigurensammlung Alfred R. Sulzer", in Malans, CHE-113.942.946, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 161 vom 20.08.2020, Publ. 1004961634).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sulzer, John Merian, von Winterthur, in Chêne-Bougeries, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004961634, Commercial Registry Office Graubünden, (350)
Stiftung "Zinnfigurensammlung Alfred R. Sulzer", in Malans, CHE-113.942.946, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 22 vom 03.02.2020, Publ. 1004820654).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Czeguhn, Ignacio, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Würzburg (DE), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004820150, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung "Zinnfigurensammlung Alfred R. Sulzer", in Küsnacht (ZH), CHE-113.942.946, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 47 vom 08.03.2017, S.0, Publ. 3390107). Die Rechtseinheit wird infolge Verlegung des Sitzes nach Malans im Handelsregister des Kantons Graubünden eingetragen und im Handelsregisteramt des Kantons Zürich von Amtes wegen gelöscht.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.