Reports for Stiftung Wohnhaus Belpberg
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Wohnhaus Belpberg
- Stiftung Wohnhaus Belpberg is active in the industry «Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled» and is currently active. The legal headquarters are in Münsingen.
- The management consists of 8 persons. The organization was founded on 12.08.1996.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 29.09.2022.
- The organization's UID is CHE-104.642.994.
Management (8)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Cornelia Doris Infang,
Julia Eva Bögli Frey,
Beat Reto Wittmann,
Dr. Adrienne Zumstein Schmid,
Fritz Emil Stettler
newest authorized signatories
Christoph Stöckli,
Beat Reto Wittmann,
Dr. Adrienne Zumstein Schmid,
Fritz Emil Stettler,
Penny Gerber
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.08.1996
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Münsingen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.7.009.002-5
UID/VAT
CHE-104.642.994
Sector
Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Schaffen von bedürfnisgerechtem Wohnraum für körperbehinderte Erwachsene im Alter zwischen 18 und 60 Jahren im Kanton Bern. Namtentlich sind dies Menschen mit Multipler Sklerose, Cerebralparese, Muskeldystrophie, Querschnittlähmung, Hirnverletzung nach Unfall oder vasculärer Schädigung, Rheumaerkrankung, Parkinson.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Schönenberger Die Treuhänder AG | Muri bei Bern | 30.01.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Balmer-Etienne AG Bern | Bern | 28.06.2007 | 29.01.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Wohnhaus Belpberg
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005571522, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Wohnhaus Belpberg, in Münsingen, CHE-104.642.994, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 20 vom 30.01.2019, Publ. 1004554106).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stettler, Fritz, von Bolligen, in Münsingen, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Zumstein Schmid, Adrienne Dr., von Seeberg, in Münsingen, Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsidentin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Wittmann, Beat Reto, von Münsingen, in Münsingen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Infang, Cornelia Doris, von Münsingen, in Münsingen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004554106, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Wohnhaus Belpberg, in Münsingen, CHE-104.642.994, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 119 vom 22.06.2017, Publ. 3595707).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Allemann Heuberger, Garbiela, von Welschenrohr, in Münsingen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Dr. Röthlisberger AG (CHE-102.704.443), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schönenberger Die Treuhänder AG (CHE-106.001.257), in Muri b. Bern (Muri bei Bern), Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 3595707, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Wohnhaus Belpberg, in Münsingen, CHE-104.642.994, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 167 vom 30.08.2016, Publ. 3027185).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lauri, Doris, von Zofingen, in Münsingen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Allemann Heuberger, Garbiela, von Welschenrohr, in Münsingen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Bögli Frey, Julia Eva, von Münsingen, in Münsingen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.