Reports for Stiftung Werner Schwarz
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Werner Schwarz
- Stiftung Werner Schwarz in Liebefeld is a Foundation from the sector «Religious, political or secular associations». Stiftung Werner Schwarz is active.
- The organization was founded on 24.07.1995.
- The organization has last changed their commercial register entry on 03.06.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- In the commercial register the organization Stiftung Werner Schwarz is registered under the UID CHE-109.478.928.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Thomas Loosli,
Sara Plutino Marti,
Barbara Vogt Röthlisberger,
Roland Von Däniken,
Jean Pierre Marcel Rausis
newest authorized signatories
Thomas Loosli,
Sara Plutino Marti,
Barbara Vogt Röthlisberger,
Roland Von Däniken,
Jean Pierre Marcel Rausis
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.07.1995
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Köniz
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.7.017.019-3
UID/VAT
CHE-109.478.928
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erhaltung und Verbreitung des künstlerischen Werks von Werner Schwarz.
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung Schwarz Werner
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Werner Schwarz
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006046130, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Werner Schwarz, in Köniz, CHE-109.478.928, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 121 vom 26.06.2023, Publ. 1005777512).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Graf, Hans Peter, von Arbon, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Loosli, Thomas, von Eriswil, in Boll (Vechigen), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten des Stiftungsrates oder dem Vizepräsidenten des Stiftungsrates.
Publication number: HR02-1005777512, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Werner Schwarz, in Köniz, CHE-109.478.928, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 106 vom 05.06.2023, Publ. 1005759845).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Ziegler, Anna Katharina, von Solothurn, in Liebefeld (Köniz), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Publication number: HR02-1005759845, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Werner Schwarz, in Köniz, CHE-109.478.928, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 38 vom 24.02.2021, Publ. 1005108641).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kuhn, Katharina, genannt Kathrin, von Bern, in Köniz, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten des Stiftungsrates.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.