Reports for Stiftung Swissgenetics
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Swissgenetics
- Stiftung Swissgenetics in Zollikofen is a Foundation from the sector «Operation of an pension fund». Stiftung Swissgenetics is active.
- Stiftung Swissgenetics has 4 persons entered in its management.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 06.08.2024.
- The organization Stiftung Swissgenetics is registered under the UID CHE-109.793.962.
- Swissgenetics Genossenschaft, SwissVets AG are registered at the same address.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Dr. Matthias Jakob Schelling,
Simon Ulrich Bach,
Barbara Lanz-Flückiger
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Matthias Jakob Schelling,
Simon Ulrich Bach,
Barbara Lanz-Flückiger
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.08.1998
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Zollikofen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.7.018.879-7
UID/VAT
CHE-109.793.962
Sector
Operation of an pension fund
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Finanzierung der Personalvorsorge der ihr angeschlossenen Unternehmen mit Sitz in der Schweiz durch Zuweisung von Arbeitgeberbeiträgen gemäss Art. 331 Abs. 3 OR aus hiefür geäufneten und gesondert ausgewiesenen Mitteln an steuerbefreite Vorsorgeeinrichtungen oder Vorsorgewerken von Sammel- und Gemeinschaftsstiftungen, welche die der Stiftung angeschlossenen Unternehmen errichteten oder welcher sie sich angeschlossen haben.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
ENGEL COPERA AG | Köniz | 16.02.2015 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung des Schweizerischen Verbandes für künstliche Besamung, Zollikofen
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Swissgenetics
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006100570, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Swissgenetics, in Zollikofen, CHE-109.793.962, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 170 vom 02.09.2022, Publ. 1005553071).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Böbner, Christoph Dr., von Entlebuch, in Hasle LU, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schelling, Matthias Dr., von St. Gallen, in Jegenstorf, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005553071, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Swissgenetics, in Zollikofen, CHE-109.793.962, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 36 vom 21.02.2020, Publ. 1004835742).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Savary, Dominique Henri, von Sâles, in Sâles, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bach, Simon Ulrich, von Saanen, in Turbach (Saanen), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004835742, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Swissgenetics, in Zollikofen, CHE-109.793.962, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 116 vom 19.06.2019, Publ. 1004654511).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lanz, Barbara, von Walterswil (BE), in Unterramsern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Geschäftsführerin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.