Reports for Stiftung Schloss Thunstetten
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Schloss Thunstetten
- Stiftung Schloss Thunstetten with its legal headquarters in Thunstetten is a Foundation from the sector «Management of real estate portfolio properties». Stiftung Schloss Thunstetten is active.
- The management of the organization Stiftung Schloss Thunstetten consists of 11 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 01.09.2023.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register BE under the UID CHE-107.174.647.
Management (11)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Cornelia Arm,
Rudolf Nyffeler,
Corinne Ulmann,
Michael Schär,
Thomas Messerli
newest authorized signatories
Cornelia Arm,
Tanja Sandra Oldag,
Rudolf Nyffeler,
Corinne Ulmann,
Michael Schär
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.09.1970
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Thunstetten
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.7.008.267-4
UID/VAT
CHE-107.174.647
Sector
Management of real estate portfolio properties
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Schlossbesitzung in Thunstetten von den Herren M. + E. Le Grand zu erwerben, um diese dem Kanton Bern und besonders dem Oberaargau als geschichtliches Denkmal zu erhalten und sie als Ort der Begegnung und zur Pflege des kulturellen Lebens zur Verfügung zu stellen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Gfeller + Partner AG | Langenthal | 14.12.2006 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Schloss Thunstetten
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005828580, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Schloss Thunstetten, in Thunstetten, CHE-107.174.647, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 235 vom 02.12.2022, Publ. 1005618112). [Streichung der Bemerkung, da nicht zum Eintragungstext gehörend] [gestrichen: Der von einer bisherigen Registerkarte übertragene Auszug enthält keine vor dem Uebertrag gestrichenen Tatsachen, und auch keine allfälligen früheren Statutendaten oder Tagebuch- und SHAB-Zitate. Diese können auf der im Feld "Uebertrag von" bezeichneten Handelsregisterkarte eingesehen werden.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Fischbach, Beat, von Villmergen, in Langenthal, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Arm, Cornelia, von Langnau im Emmental, in Langenthal, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005618112, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Schloss Thunstetten, in Thunstetten, CHE-107.174.647, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 240 vom 09.12.2020, Publ. 1005042941).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gygax, Markus, von Thunstetten, in Thunstetten, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rickli, Elisabeth, von Thunstetten, in Thunstetten (Bützberg), Verwalterin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Le Grand, Vera, von Basel, in Langenthal, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Oldag, Tanja Sandra, von Affoltern im Emmental, in Aarwangen, Verwalterin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005042941, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Schloss Thunstetten, in Thunstetten, CHE-107.174.647, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 207 vom 25.10.2019, Publ. 1004745042).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Fischbach, Beat, von Villmergen, in Langenthal, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Kull-Kramer, Gertrud, von Niederlenz, in Langenthal, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Nyffeler, Rudolf, von Huttwil, in Walliswil b. Niederbipp (Walliswil bei Niederbipp), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.