Reports for Stiftung Schloss Münchenwiler
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Schloss Münchenwiler
- Stiftung Schloss Münchenwiler is a Foundation with its legal headquarters in Münchenwiler. Stiftung Schloss Münchenwiler belongs to the industry «Religious, political or secular associations» and is currently active.
- Stiftung Schloss Münchenwiler was founded on 19.11.2004.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 12.02.2024.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-112.112.132.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Monika Caduff Kessler,
Yvonne Suter,
Olivier Schmid,
Beat von Niederhäusern,
Daniel G. Ryhiner
newest authorized signatories
Monika Caduff Kessler,
Yvonne Suter,
Olivier Schmid,
Beat von Niederhäusern,
Daniel G. Ryhiner
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.11.2004
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Münchenwiler
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.7.033.737-9
UID/VAT
CHE-112.112.132
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt das dem Kanton Bern gehörende Schloss Münchenwiler dem Kanton Bern und seinen Bürgern in seiner Bedeutung als Stätte der Kultur, Religion und als gesellschaftliches Zentrum der Region zu erhalten. Sie kann auf Gesuch Beiträge ausrichten für Anlässe im obigen Sinn, welche im Schloss bzw. auf dem Schlossareal organisiert werden und der Öffentlichkeit zugänglich sind. Die Stiftung hat gemeinnützigen Charakter und verfolgt keinen Erwerbszweck.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Schneider Treuhand und Revisions AG | Zollikofen | 29.03.2007 | 15.12.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Schloss Münchenwiler
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005958361, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Schloss Münchenwiler, in Münchenwiler, CHE-112.112.132, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 100 vom 26.05.2020, Publ. 1004896582).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Caduff Kessler, Monika, von Düdingen, in Münchenwiler, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004896582, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Schloss Münchenwiler, in Münchenwiler, CHE-112.112.132, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 54 vom 19.03.2014, S.0, Publ. 1405357).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Sommer, Heinz, von Bern und Sumiswald, in Bern, Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Suter, Yvonne, von Zürich, in Münchenwiler, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Ryhiner, Daniel, von Basel, in Ligerz, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Schmid, Olivier, von Niedermuhlern, in Münchenwiler, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
von Niederhäusern, Beat, von Wattenwil, in Münchenwiler, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: 1405357, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Schloss Münchenwiler, in Münchenwiler, CHE-112.112.132, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 243 vom 16.12.2013, Publ. 1237819).
Domizil neu:
Epinette 63, 1797 Münchenwiler.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schluep, Jakob, von Bellach und Nennigkofen, in Münchenwiler, Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Tappenbeck, Christian Ralph, von Bern und Bremgarten bei Bern, in Münchenwiler, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schenk Jenzer, Elisabeth, von Signau und Thunstetten, in Münchenwiler, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Suter, Yvonne, von Zürich, in Münchenwiler, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
von Niederhäusern, Beat, von Wattenwil, in Münchenwiler, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.