Reports for Stiftung Rosenegg
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Rosenegg
- Stiftung Rosenegg is currently active and the industry «Religious, political or secular associations». The legal headquarters are in Kreuzlingen.
- The management has 10 active persons registered.
- The last commercial register change was made on 22.01.2024. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- In the commercial register the organization Stiftung Rosenegg is registered under the UID CHE-110.406.261.
Management (10)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Addisalem Hebeisen,
Christina Egli,
Daniel Moos,
Martin A. Engelhart,
Marlyse Schilling
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
31.08.1998
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Kreuzlingen
Commercial Registry Office
TG
Commercial register number
CH-440.7.010.592-0
UID/VAT
CHE-110.406.261
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Übernahme (zu Eigentum oder im Baurecht), dauernde Erhaltung, Nutzung, Betrieb und Verwaltung des Gebäudes Rosenegg sowie Schaffung repräsentativer Räumlichkeiten für Anlässe der Stadt und anderer Institutionen oder Personen, Übernahme und Führung des Museums Rosenegg (ehemals Heimatmuseum); Übernahme, Instandstellung sowie allenfalls Verwaltung und Nutzung weiterer Gebäulichkeiten mit wertvoller erhaltenswerter Bausubstanz auf dem Gebiet der Stadt Kreuzlingen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Trewitax Kreuzlingen AG | Kreuzlingen | 23.02.2022 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Rosenegg
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005940490, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Stiftung Rosenegg, in Kreuzlingen, CHE-110.406.261, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 173 vom 07.09.2022, Publ. 1005556860). [Teils-Aktualisierung der Funktionsbezeichnung.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Raggenbass Beringer, Dorothea, genannt Dorena, von Schönholzerswilen, in Kreuzlingen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Rüedi, Beat, von Gächlingen, in Kreuzlingen, Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Aemisegger, Markus, von Hemberg, in Triboltingen (Ermatingen), Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Vizepräsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Amstutz, Markus, von Küssnacht (SZ), in Neuwilen (Kemmental), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Egli, Christina, von Birmensdorf (ZH), in Kreuzlingen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Hebeisen, Addisalem, genannt Addisa, von Langnau im Emmental, in Kreuzlingen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Moos, Daniel, von Kreuzlingen, in Kreuzlingen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Strasser, Georg, von Frauenfeld, in Kreuzlingen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Aktuar, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005556860, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Stiftung Rosenegg, in Kreuzlingen, CHE-110.406.261, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 38 vom 23.02.2022, Publ. 1005412724).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Istas, Dr. Yvonne, deutsche Staatsangehörige, in Bodman-Ludwigshafen (DE), Verwalterin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bruder, David, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Konstanz (DE), Verwalter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005412724, Commercial Registry Office Thurgau, (440)
Stiftung Rosenegg, in Kreuzlingen, CHE-110.406.261, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 88 vom 07.05.2021, Publ. 1005173672).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Trewitax Kreuzlingen AG (CHE-109.598.254), in Kreuzlingen, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.