Address
c/o S. Nadig
Langhaldenstrasse 11
8803 Rüschlikon
Reports for Stiftung Pfadfinderheim Rüschlikon
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Pfadfinderheim Rüschlikon
- Stiftung Pfadfinderheim Rüschlikon with its legal headquarters in Rüschlikon is active. Stiftung Pfadfinderheim Rüschlikon operates in the sector «Operation of holiday cottages».
- Stiftung Pfadfinderheim Rüschlikon was founded on 21.09.1968.
- The organization has last changed their commercial register entry on 22.07.2024, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- Stiftung Pfadfinderheim Rüschlikon is registered in the Canton of ZH under the UID CHE-103.517.984.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Eric Utzinger,
Sabine Bär-Graf,
Daniel Riniker,
Jennifer Rossiter,
Sabine Nadig
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.09.1968
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Rüschlikon
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.904.411-7
UID/VAT
CHE-103.517.984
Sector
Operation of holiday cottages
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Bau und Betrieb eines Heimes für die Rüschliker Pfadfinder.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Burger Treuhand AG | Horgen | 28.07.2017 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Lehmann, Treuhand- und Steuerberatungsbüro | Rüschlikon | 23.12.2009 | 27.07.2017 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Pfadfinderheim Rüschlikon
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006090019, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Pfadfinderheim Rüschlikon, in Rüschlikon, CHE-103.517.984, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 06.07.2023, Publ. 1005788215).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Keller, Jasmin, von Freienbach, in Adliswil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Utzinger, Eric, von Bachenbülach, in Thalwil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Burger Treuhand AG (CHE-101.821.709), in Horgen, Revisionsstelle [bisher: in Zug].
Publication number: HR02-1005788215, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Pfadfinderheim Rüschlikon, in Rüschlikon, CHE-103.517.984, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 145 vom 28.07.2017, S.0, Publ. 3671037).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht des Kantons Zürich (BVS) (CHE-239.560.630). [Eintrag auf Grund des geänderten Gesetzes über die BVG- und Stiftungsaufsicht (BVSG) vom 07.02.2022.]
Publication number: 3671037, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Pfadfinderheim Rüschlikon, in Rüschlikon, CHE-103.517.984, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 249 vom 23.12.2009, S. 37, Publ. 5409918). [Gestrichene Angaben über die Organisation aufgrund geänderter Eintragungsvorschriften gemäss Art. 95 HRegV.].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Weber, Karin, von Adliswil und Horgen, in Rüschlikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Zumbrunnen, Thomas, von Zweisimmen, in Zumikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Nef, Flavio, von Urnäsch, in Adliswil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Riniker, Tina, von Zürich, in Kilchberg ZH, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Vouillamoz, Damien, von Nendaz, in Kilchberg ZH, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Charles Lehmann, Treuhand- und Steuerberatungsbüro (CH-020.1.910.954-8), in Rüschlikon, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bär-Graf, Sabine, von Rüschlikon, in Rüschlikon, Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Rossiter, Jennifer, von Bettlach, in Rüschlikon, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Riniker, Daniel, von Zürich, in Kilchberg ZH, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Keller, Jasmin, von Freienbach, in Adliswil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Burger Treuhand AG (CHE-101.821.709), in Zug, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.