Reports for Stiftung Paul Zuppinger
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Paul Zuppinger
- Stiftung Paul Zuppinger with its legal headquarters in Burgdorf is active. Stiftung Paul Zuppinger operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- Stiftung Paul Zuppinger has 4 persons entered in its management.
- The organization has last changed their commercial register entry on 07.09.2017, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is CHE-110.401.252.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
09.09.1996
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Burgdorf
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.7.003.054-6
UID/VAT
CHE-110.401.252
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Unterstützung und Förderung der klassischen Malerei, der klassischen Musik und der klassischen Literatur, namentlich die finanzielle Unterstützung und Förderung von talentierten Künstlern, die Organisation, Durchführung und Unterstützung von Kunstausstellungen und Kunstveranstaltungen. Im übrigen vgl. Stiftungsurkunde.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
HJ Treuhand GmbH | Bern | 03.01.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung Zuppinger Paul
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Paul Zuppinger
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3738759, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Paul Zuppinger, in Burgdorf, CHE-110.401.252, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 02.06.2015, Publ. 2181681).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grimm, Andreas, von Burgdorf, in Burgdorf, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 2181681, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Paul Zuppinger, in Burgdorf, CHE-110.401.252, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 27 vom 10.02.2015, Publ. 1981877).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Jauk, Theresia, österreichische Staatsangehörige, in Burgdorf, Sekretärin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Lüthi, Werner, von Langnau im Emmental, in Burgdorf, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1981877, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Paul Zuppinger, in Burgdorf, CHE-110.401.252, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 1 vom 03.01.2006, S. 2, Publ. 3177582).
Organisation neu:
[Streichung der Organisation von Amtes wegen, da nicht zum Eintragungstext gehörend.].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
HJ Treuhand GmbH (CHE-108.237.641), in Bern, Revisionsstelle [bisher: HJ Treuhand GmbH].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.