Reports for Stiftung Mühle Otelfingen
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Mühle Otelfingen
- Stiftung Mühle Otelfingen has its legal headquarters in Otelfingen and is active. It operates in the sector «Operation of libraries and museums».
- Stiftung Mühle Otelfingen has 10 persons entered in its management.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 18.07.2023. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- In the commercial register the organization Stiftung Mühle Otelfingen is registered under the UID CHE-109.672.413.
Management (10)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Barbara Rebekka Hänggi-Bräm,
Dominique Christian Huber,
Dr. Felix Rudolf Althaus,
Britta Roth,
Wolfgang Wörnhard
newest authorized signatories
Barbara Rebekka Hänggi-Bräm,
Dominique Christian Huber,
Dr. Felix Rudolf Althaus,
Britta Roth,
Wolfgang Wörnhard
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
21.12.2001
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Otelfingen
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.000.932-4
UID/VAT
CHE-109.672.413
Sector
Operation of libraries and museums
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
1) Das Hauptgebäude (Mühle) aussen und innen im Zustand zu erhalten, wie es sich seit der Renovation von 1968/69 bis heute präsentiert. Geringfügige Aenderungen sind ausschliesslich im Rahmen des Vertrages mit der Kantonalen Baudirektion und nach Absprache mit der Kantonalen Denkmalpflege möglich. Zudem bedarf es der Einstimmigkeit des Stiftungsrates. 2) Die Hofstatt mit den drei sie bildenden Gebäulichkeiten zu erhalten. Das Oekonomiegebäude unter Berücksichtigung des Vertrages mit der Denkmalpflege den Bedürfnissen der Stiftung anzupassen. Den Weinkeller (von 1703) und im wesentlichen die Fassaden zu erhalten; auf dem gesamten Areal der Unteren Mühle kulturelle Anlässe und Tätigkeiten, auch kulinarischer Natur, im weitesten Sinne zu ermöglichen und zu fördern, die Gebäulichkeiten der Oeffentlichkeit zu entsprechender Nutzung zur Verfügung zu stellen und allgemein einer lebhaften, aufbauenden Kultur förderlich zu sein.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Meng und Partner Revisions AG | Baden | 30.11.2021 |
Former auditor (3)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Hans Ulrich Giezendanner, Dr.oec.publ., dipl. Wirtschaftsprüfer | Rüschlikon | 13.08.2015 | 29.11.2021 | |
GIEZENDANNER Audit & Consulting GmbH in Liquidation | Rüschlikon | 27.05.2011 | 12.08.2015 | |
Furttal Treuhand AG | Otelfingen | 02.05.2007 | 16.05.2010 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Mühle Otelfingen
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005797636, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Mühle Otelfingen, in Otelfingen, CHE-109.672.413, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 233 vom 30.11.2021, Publ. 1005345211).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Huber, Dominique Christian, von Häggenschwil, in Otelfingen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hänggi, Barbara Rebekka, von Otelfingen, in Boppelsen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005345211, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Mühle Otelfingen, in Otelfingen, CHE-109.672.413, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 112 vom 13.06.2019, Publ. 1004649803).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Maag Gieriet, Vera, von Domat/Ems, in Dielsdorf, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hans Ulrich Giezendanner, Dr. oec. publ., dipl. Wirtschaftsprüfer (CHE-113.845.527), in Rüschlikon, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Althaus, Felix, von Langnau im Emmental, in Otelfingen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Meng und Partner Revisions AG (CHE-103.371.568), in Baden, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004649803, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Mühle Otelfingen, in Otelfingen, CHE-109.672.413, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 143 vom 26.07.2018, Publ. 4382503).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Roth, Britta, von Wangen an der Aare, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.