Address
c/o SRF Schweizer Radio und Fernsehen, ZN d. Schw. Radio- und Fernsehges.
Fernsehstrasse 1-4
8052 Zürich
Reports for Stiftung Kulturerbe von Schweizer Radio und Fernsehen (SRF)
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Kulturerbe von Schweizer Radio und Fernsehen (SRF)
- Stiftung Kulturerbe von Schweizer Radio und Fernsehen (SRF) has its legal headquarters in Zürich and is active. It is a Foundation and active in the industry «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management has 7 active persons registered.
- The organization has last changed their commercial register entry on 12.09.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register ZH under the UID CHE-283.892.403.
- Next to the organization Stiftung Kulturerbe von Schweizer Radio und Fernsehen (SRF) there are 4 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Radio- und Fernsehgenossenschaft Zürich Schaffhausen (RFZ), Radio- und Fernsehgesellschaft der deutschen und der rätoromanischen Schweiz, SRF Schweizer Radio und Fernsehen, Zweigniederlassung der Schweizerischen Radio- und Fernsehgesellschaft.
Management (7)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Susanne Wille Fischlin,
Nathalie Wappler Hagen,
Theodor Robert Mäusli,
Dr. Christoph Lothar Stühn,
Martin Meyer
newest authorized signatories
Susanne Wille Fischlin,
Nathalie Wappler Hagen,
Daniel Knoll,
Theodor Robert Mäusli,
Dr. Christoph Lothar Stühn
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.11.2014
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.001.975-9
UID/VAT
CHE-283.892.403
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt Mittel zu sammeln für den Erhalt des audiovisuellen Erbes von SRF Schweizer Radio und Fernsehen (SRF), Zweigniederlassung Zürich der Schweizerischen Radio- und Fernsehgesellschaft mit Sitz in Bern; finanzielle Unterstützung und Förderung von Projekten von SRF zur Pflege und Erhaltung von deren audiovisuellen Erbes; den Zugang der Öffentlichkeit zu diesem audiovisuellen Kulturgut zu verbessern; keinerlei kommerzielle Ziele zu verfolgen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Zürich | 04.02.2019 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zürich | 17.11.2014 | 03.02.2019 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung Kulturerbe von Schweizer Radio und Fernsehen SRF
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Kulturerbe von Schweizer Radio und Fernsehen (SRF)
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005835836, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Kulturerbe von Schweizer Radio und Fernsehen (SRF), in Zürich, CHE-283.892.403, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 58 vom 24.03.2021, Publ. 1005131814).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Figini, Sandra, von Vacallo, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005131814, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Kulturerbe von Schweizer Radio und Fernsehen (SRF), in Zürich, CHE-283.892.403, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 202 vom 16.10.2020, Publ. 1005001388).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Charles, Stefan, von Linden, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wille Fischlin, Susanne, von Ingenbohl, in Boniswil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005001388, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Kulturerbe von Schweizer Radio und Fernsehen (SRF), in Zürich, CHE-283.892.403, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 92 vom 14.05.2019, Publ. 1004629181).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Matter, Rudolf, von Muhen, in Küsnacht ZH, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wappler Hagen, Nathalie, von Kreuzlingen, in Zürich, Präsidentin des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.