Reports for Stiftung intact
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung intact
- Stiftung intact has its legal headquarters in Burgdorf, is active and operates in the sector «Other social services».
- There are 8 active persons registered in the management.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 19.12.2022.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register BE under the UID CHE-209.729.551.
Management (8)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Christine Anne Sager,
Peter Claudius Masciadri,
Astrid Maria Madeleine Furtwängler-Rey,
Dr. Regina Barbara Natsch Keller,
Jann Gehri
newest authorized signatories
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.09.2011
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Burgdorf
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-036.7.051.931-7
UID/VAT
CHE-209.729.551
Sector
Other social services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung ermöglicht benachteiligten Menschen Beschäftigung und Integration mit sinnvollen Arbeitsangeboten und eröffnet ihnen Chancen für den Übertritt in den ersten Arbeitsmarkt. Die Stiftung erbringt sozial und/oder ökologisch sinnvolle Dienstleistungen. Tragende Eckpfeiler sind eine nachhaltige Mobilität, Begegnungsmöglichkeiten für die Öffentlichkeit und innovative Produkte mit regionaler Wertschöpfung. Sie kann ferner Grundstücke erwerben und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Stiftung zu fördern oder damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Hagmann Treuhand AG | Bern | 30.09.2011 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung intact
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005631575, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung intact, in Burgdorf, CHE-209.729.551, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 1 vom 04.01.2021, Publ. 1005063252).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stucki, Stephan Ernst, von Konolfingen, in Burgdorf, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Täuber, Martin, von Winterthur, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wälti , Martin, von Rüderswil, in Burgdorf, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Co-Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Masciadri, Peter, von Rüti (ZH), in Innerberg (Wohlen bei Bern), Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Sager, Christine Anne, von Menziken, in Gümligen (Muri bei Bern), Vizepräsidentin des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Furtwängler-Rey, Astrid Maria Madeleine, von Zürich, in Muri b. Bern (Muri bei Bern), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Gehri, Jann, von Seedorf (BE), in Brugg AG (Brugg), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Natsch Keller, Regina Barbara, von Schwellbrunn, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Bucher, Theophil, von Kerns und Horw, in Burgdorf, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Kerns und Horw, Co-Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005063252, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung intact, in Burgdorf, CHE-209.729.551, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 29 vom 12.02.2020, Publ. 1004828062).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bucher, Theophil, von Kerns und Horw, in Burgdorf, Co-Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Co-Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Wälti , Martin, von Rüderswil, in Burgdorf, Co-Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Co-Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: HR02-1004828062, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung intact, in Burgdorf, CHE-209.729.551, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 233 vom 30.11.2016, Publ. 3192539).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bucher, Theophil, von Kerns und Horw, in Burgdorf, Co-Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Co-Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Wälti , Martin, von Rüderswil, in Burgdorf, Co-Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Co-Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Masciadri, Peter, von Rüti (ZH), in Innerberg (Wohlen bei Bern), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Stucki, Stephan Ernst, von Konolfingen, in Burgdorf, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.