Reports for Stiftung Horizonte Sutz
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Horizonte Sutz
- Stiftung Horizonte Sutz is currently active and the industry «Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled». The legal headquarters are in Sutz.
- Stiftung Horizonte Sutz was founded on 08.07.1972.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 13.12.2022. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BE is CHE-107.206.193.
Management (9)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Corinne Liechti,
Tamara Burkhalter,
Gabriele Di Francesco,
Pascal Olivier Gerber-Eggimann,
Sven Eric Tschanz
newest authorized signatories
Tamara Burkhalter,
Rita Scheidegger-Jüstrich,
Gabriele Di Francesco,
Pascal Olivier Gerber-Eggimann,
Sven Eric Tschanz
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.07.1972
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Sutz-Lattrigen
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.7.004.605-8
UID/VAT
CHE-107.206.193
Sector
Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt die Errichtung, Betreibung und Förderung von Lebensgemeinschaften mit behinderten Kindern, Jugendlichen und Erwachsenen. Diese Lebensgemeinschaften dienen der körperlichen, seelischen und geistigen Ausbildung und Entfaltung, sowie der sozialen, kulturellen und beruflichen Eingliederung von Behinderten unter Wahrung ihrer Persönlichkeit. Die Einrichtungen der Stiftung sind politisch und konfessionell neutral. Die Stiftung ist im Rahmen der Zwecksetzung im Kanton Bern tätig. Gewinn und Kapital der Stiftung sind ausschliesslich dem vorstehend genannten Zweck gewidmet. Erwerbszwecke sind ausgeschlossen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Gfeller + Partner AG | Bern | 07.06.2013 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treuhandbüro Sutter AG | Langnau im Emmental | 16.11.2006 | 06.06.2013 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung Wohn- und Werksiedlung St. Michael
- Wohn- und Werksiedlung St. Michael
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Horizonte Sutz
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005626901, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Horizonte Sutz, in Sutz-Lattrigen, CHE-107.206.193, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 162 vom 23.08.2022, Publ. 1005545562).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zülli, Liselotte, von Kirchdorf (BE), in Ipsach, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Burkhalter, Tamara, von Seeberg, in Sutz (Sutz-Lattrigen), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Liechti, Corinne, von Landiswil, in Nidau, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005545562, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Horizonte Sutz, in Sutz-Lattrigen, CHE-107.206.193, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 1 vom 03.01.2022, Publ. 1005372077).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Liechti, Silvia, von Luzern, in Orpund, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Bräm, Jeannette, von Höri, in Biel/Bienne, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Scheidegger, Rita , von Berneck, in Epsach, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005372077, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Horizonte Sutz, in Sutz-Lattrigen, CHE-107.206.193, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 87 vom 07.05.2019, Publ. 1004624221).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Brandstetter, Anton, von Beromünster, in Sutz-Lattrigen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Di Francesco, Gabriele, von Ipsach, in Ipsach, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Liechti, Silvia, von Luzern, in Orpund, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Lustenberger, Sabine, von Hasle bei Burgdorf und Zürich, in Biel/Bienne, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.