Address
c/o Dr. iur. Gieri Bolliger, Stiftung für das Tier im Recht
Rigistrasse 9
8033 Zürich
Reports for Stiftung für das Wohl des Hundes
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung für das Wohl des Hundes
- Stiftung für das Wohl des Hundes from Zürich operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations» and is active.
- The management has 6 active persons registered.
- The commercial register entry of the organization was last modified on 18.08.2021. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The UID registered in the commercial register of ZH is CHE-110.408.745.
- On the same address there are 8 other active companies registered. These include: Bettina Bärtsch - Psychologin, Carepoint-Affolter, Egli Psychotherapie.
Management (6)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Dr. Heinrich Binder,
Barbara Welti,
Dr. Marlene Zähner,
Ulrich Rudolf Graf
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Heinrich Binder,
Barbara Welti,
Dr. Marlene Zähner,
Christoph Hunn,
Ulrich Rudolf Graf
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
18.06.1999
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Zürich
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.000.673-9
UID/VAT
CHE-110.408.745
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Unterstützt und fördert die umfassende Anwendung und Weiterentwicklung von Massnahmen zum Wohl des Hundes im In- und Ausland, namentlich zur Förderung des Tierschutzes in Zucht, Haltung, Pflege und Ernährung auf ethischer, naturwissenschaftlicher und rechtlicher Grundlage.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
UTA Treuhand AG Kleindöttingen | Böttstein | 15.09.2020 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
STR Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | Freienbach | 17.09.2013 | 14.09.2020 | |
Advisor Treuhand AG | Adliswil | 26.07.2010 | 16.09.2013 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Foundation for the Wellbeing of the Dog
- Fondation pour le bien-être du chien
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung für das Wohl des Hundes
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005272870, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung für das Wohl des Hundes, in Zürich, CHE-110.408.745, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 179 vom 15.09.2020, Publ. 1004978592).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Binder, Heinrich, von Mettmenstetten, in Zell (ZH), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004978592, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung für das Wohl des Hundes, in Zürich, CHE-110.408.745, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 79 vom 25.04.2019, Publ. 1004616720).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
STR Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-115.937.583), in Freienbach, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
UTA Treuhand AG Kleindöttingen (CHE-107.100.301), in Böttstein, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004616720, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung für das Wohl des Hundes, in Zürich, CHE-110.408.745, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 96 vom 20.05.2016, S.0, Publ. 2841497).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Spring, Alexandra, von Seedorf BE, in Nidau, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Welti, Barbara, von Gipf-Oberfrick, in Büron, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.