Address
c/o Ursula Hadorn
Teussenrain 27
3454 Sumiswald
Reports for Stiftung Ferienheim für Behinderte in Iseltwald
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Ferienheim für Behinderte in Iseltwald
- Stiftung Ferienheim für Behinderte in Iseltwald has its legal headquarters in Sumiswald, is active and operates in the sector «Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled».
- The organization was founded on 05.07.1975.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 18.12.2020. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The UID registered in the commercial register of BE is CHE-108.038.432.
Management (8)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Gerardo Grasso,
Lorenz Arnold Gerber,
Marcel Stähli,
Annemarie Fässler,
Ulrich Herrmann
newest authorized signatories
Gerardo Grasso,
Lorenz Arnold Gerber,
Marcel Stähli,
Ursula Hadorn-Gfeller
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.07.1975
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Sumiswald
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-053.7.001.024-1
UID/VAT
CHE-108.038.432
Sector
Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt den Betrieb und die Führung des seit 1959 bestehenden Ferienheims für Behinderte in Iseltwald am Brienzersee auf gemeinnütziger Basis. Das Heim soll Menschen mit einer Behinderung und ihren Begleitern während einer, durch den Stiftungsrat festgelegten Jahreszeit zu einem günstigen, aber kostendeckenden Pensionspreis zur Verfügung stehen. Die Vermietung ist in einem separaten Reglement zu regeln. Die Stiftung kann zur Erreichung des Zweckes auch bauliche Erweiterungen vornehmen und Grundstücke erwerben. Gewinn und Kapital der Stiftung sind ausschliesslich dem vorstehend genannten Zweck gewidmet. Erwerbszwecke sind ausgeschlossen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Langenthal | 23.01.2020 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
accontax Markus Gfeller Treuhand AG | Langenthal | 23.02.2009 | 22.01.2020 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Erholungs- und Ferienheim für Behinderte, 3807 Iseltwald-Feld
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Ferienheim für Behinderte in Iseltwald
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005051657, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Ferienheim für Behinderte in Iseltwald, in Sumiswald, CHE-108.038.432, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 33 vom 18.02.2020, Publ. 1004832601).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Königbauer, Josef, von Rüdtligen-Alchenflüh, in Rüdtligen (Rüdtligen-Alchenflüh), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1004832601, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Ferienheim für Behinderte in Iseltwald, in Sumiswald, CHE-108.038.432, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 15 vom 23.01.2020, Publ. 1004812127).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stähli, Marcel, von Hofstetten bei Brienz, in Urtenen-Schönbühl, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Kräiligen (Bätterkinden)].
Publication number: HR02-1004812127, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Ferienheim für Behinderte in Iseltwald, in Sumiswald, CHE-108.038.432, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 216 vom 07.11.2018, Publ. 1004492147).
Weitere Adressen:
[gestrichen: c/o Ursula Zimmermann, Kanalweg 10a, 3422 Kirchberg BE].
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Zimmermann, Ursula, von Lützelflüh, in Kirchberg BE, Mitglied + Verwalterin, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
accontax Markus Gfeller Treuhand AG (CHE-101.350.360), in Langenthal, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stähli, Marcel, von Hofstetten bei Brienz, in Kräiligen (Bätterkinden), Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Grasso, Gerardo, von Sumiswald, in Ostermundigen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, Verwalter, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Hadorn-Gfeller, Ursula, von Forst-Längenbühl, in Sumiswald, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Fässler, Annemarie, von Röthenbach im Emmental, in Worb, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Fässler, Hans Rudolf, von Bubendorf, in Biglen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Herrmann, Ulrich, von Langnau im Emmental, in Burgdorf, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Königbauer, Josef, von Rüdtligen-Alchenflüh, in Rüdtligen (Rüdtligen-Alchenflüh), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung [bisher: Mitglied, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
BDO AG (CHE-408.158.150), in Langenthal, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.