Address
c/o Herbert Geiser
Buechwaldstrasse 66
3627 Heimberg
Reports for Stiftung CONTACTIONS
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung CONTACTIONS
- Stiftung CONTACTIONS from Heimberg operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations» and is active.
- There are 9 active persons registered in the management.
- On the 03.09.2024 the commercial register entry of the organization was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register BE under the UID CHE-109.327.100.
Management (9)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Roland Donzé,
Peter Grunder,
Andreas Rapp,
Andreas Gafner-Sollberger,
Herbert Geiser
newest authorized signatories
Roland Donzé,
Peter Grunder,
Andreas Rapp,
Andreas Gafner-Sollberger,
Herbert Geiser
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
23.01.1982
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Heimberg
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-073.7.004.331-5
UID/VAT
CHE-109.327.100
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt die Förderung von Tätigkeiten und Projekten, die zur Verbesserung der Lebensumstände von bedürftigen und benachteiligten Menschen, insbesondere von Kindern, in Entwicklungsländern führen. Hierzu leistet die Stiftung finanzielle Hilfe und fördert die Verbreitung von christlichen Werten. Die Stiftung hat keinen Erwerbszweck und erstrebt keinen Gewinn.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Unico Treuhand AG | Burgdorf | 15.11.2007 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung 'CONTACTIONS'
- Stiftung "Pro Abbeville"
- Stiftung Pro Abbeville
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung CONTACTIONS
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006120228, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung CONTACTIONS, in Heimberg, CHE-109.327.100, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 14 vom 22.01.2024, Publ. 1005939857).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kertscher, Murielle, von Ins, in Yvonand, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005939857, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung CONTACTIONS, in Heimberg, CHE-109.327.100, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 26 vom 07.02.2023, Publ. 1005671633).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Reinhard, Jürgen, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Küssaberg/Rheinheim (DE), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Donzé, Roland, von Luzern, in Unterseen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005671633, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung CONTACTIONS, in Heimberg, CHE-109.327.100, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 218 vom 09.11.2022, Publ. 1005600140).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Grunder, Peter, von Vechigen, in Radelfingen b. Aarberg (Radelfingen), Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.