Reports for Stiftung Bühl
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Bühl
- Stiftung Bühl has its legal headquarters in Wädenswil and is active. It is a Foundation and active in the industry «Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled».
- The management of the organization Stiftung Bühl consists of 11 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 16.08.2023.
- In the commercial register the organization Stiftung Bühl is registered under the UID CHE-107.203.473.
Management (11)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Peter Michael Wehrli,
Beatrix Kronenberg,
Marianne Andrée Schambeck Strnad,
Susanna Zürrer-Simmen,
Andreas Müller
newest authorized signatories
Thomas Pfenninger,
Susanna Zürrer-Simmen,
Andreas Müller,
Brigitte Steimen,
Gion A. Dettwiler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.06.1933
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Wädenswil
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.7.904.309-8
UID/VAT
CHE-107.203.473
Sector
Operation of homes for the elderly and disabled
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt den Betrieb einer Einrichtung, in der Kindern, Jugendlichen und Erwachsenen mit geistiger Behinderung oder Lernbehinderung in den Bereichen Schule, Berufsbildung, Arbeit sowie Wohnen und Freizeit bedürfnisgerechte Lebens- und Entwicklungsräume angeboten werden. Die Stiftung verfolgt einen gemeinnützigen Zweck und ist nicht gewinnorientiert.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PricewaterhouseCoopers AG | Zürich | 05.03.2012 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
BDO AG | Zürich | 15.01.2009 | 04.03.2012 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Bühl
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005817279, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Nachtrag zum im SHAB Nr. 153 vom 10.08.2023 publizierten TR-Eintrag Nr. 32741 vom 07.08.2023 Stiftung Bühl, in Wädenswil, CHE-107.203.473, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 153 vom 10.08.2023, Publ. 1005813571). Die Liste der Belege wurde ergänzt.
Publication number: HR02-1005813571, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Bühl, in Wädenswil, CHE-107.203.473, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 233 vom 30.11.2022, Publ. 1005615820).
Urkundenänderung:
30.05.2023.
Zweck neu:
Die Stiftung bezweckt den Betrieb einer Einrichtung, in der Kindern, Jugendlichen und Erwachsenen mit geistiger Behinderung oder Lernbehinderung in den Bereichen Schule, Berufsbildung, Arbeit sowie Wohnen und Freizeit bedürfnisgerechte Lebens- und Entwicklungsräume angeboten werden. Die Stiftung verfolgt einen gemeinnützigen Zweck und ist nicht gewinnorientiert.
Publication number: HR02-1005615820, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Stiftung Bühl, in Wädenswil, CHE-107.203.473, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 5 vom 08.01.2021, Publ. 1005068356).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bürgi, Cornelia, von Feusisberg, in Zürich, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Erni, Jonas, von Zürich, in Wädenswil, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wehrli, Peter, von Zürich und Buch am Irchel, in Männedorf, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.