Address
c/o Kai Baumann
Schillingstrasse 10
3005 Bern
Reports for Stiftung Berty Maikler
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung Berty Maikler
- Stiftung Berty Maikler has its legal headquarters in Bern and is active. It operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management of the organization Stiftung Berty Maikler consists of 4 persons.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 11.07.2024.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Stiftung Berty Maikler is the following: CHE-110.381.158.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Kai Dorian Baumann,
Barbara Renate Baumann-Seiling,
Christiane Frey
newest authorized signatories
Kai Dorian Baumann,
Barbara Renate Baumann-Seiling,
Christiane Frey
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.09.1986
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Bern
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-035.7.016.830-9
UID/VAT
CHE-110.381.158
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung bezweckt, blinden Kindern, sei es von Geburt an oder durch Krankheit, eine Ausbildung zu einem möglichst selbständigen Leben zu ermöglichen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Dr.Meyer Treuhand AG | Bern | 11.07.2024 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Die Wirtschaftsprüfer.ch AG | Thun | 08.06.2022 | 10.07.2024 | |
STEINHAUSER Treuhand und Steuerberatung | Lyss | 24.12.2012 | 07.06.2022 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung Maikler Berty
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung Berty Maikler
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006081569, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Berty Maikler, in Bern, CHE-110.381.158, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 109 vom 08.06.2022, Publ. 1005490127).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Die Wirtschaftsprüfer.ch AG (CHE-109.874.023), in Thun, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Dr.Meyer Treuhand AG (CHE-108.133.958), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005490127, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Berty Maikler, in Bern, CHE-110.381.158, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 199 vom 13.10.2020, Publ. 1004998523).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
STEINHAUSER Treuhand und Steuerberatung (CHE-112.515.292), in Lyss, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Die Wirtschaftsprüfer.ch AG (CHE-109.874.023), in Thun, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1004998523, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stiftung Berty Maikler, in Bern, CHE-110.381.158, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 64 vom 04.04.2018, Publ. 4148353).
Domizil neu:
c/o Kai Baumann, Schillingstrasse 10, 3005 Bern.
Weitere Adressen:
c/o Kai Baumann, Rechtsanwalt und Notar, Bernstrasse 30, 3067 Boll.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Flückiger, Christian, von Auswil, in Bern, Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Baumann, Kai Dorian, von Zürich und Bern, in Bern, Präsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Frey, Christiane, von Bern, in Bern, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.