Address
c/o Gemeindeverwaltung
Hauptgasse 1
3997 Bellwald
Reports for Stiftung "altes Bellwald"
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung "altes Bellwald"
- Stiftung "altes Bellwald" in Bellwald is a Foundation from the sector «Religious, political or secular associations». Stiftung "altes Bellwald" is active.
- The management of the organization Stiftung "altes Bellwald", which was founded on the 19.10.1984, consists of 9 persons.
- The organization has last modified its commercial register entry on 23.08.2021. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The organization Stiftung "altes Bellwald" is registered under the UID CHE-102.014.060.
Management (9)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Michael Albert Wyden,
Roger Holzer,
Simon Volken,
Hans Rudolf Kipfer,
Martin Perren-Zufferey
newest authorized signatories
Michael Albert Wyden,
Roger Holzer,
Simon Volken,
Hans Rudolf Kipfer,
Martin Perren-Zufferey
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.10.1984
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Bellwald
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-600.7.001.153-1
UID/VAT
CHE-102.014.060
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erhaltung der alten Dorfsubstanz und die Wahrung oder Wiederherstellung des ursprünglichen Dorfbildes von Bellwald.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Schwestermann & Michel Treuhand AG | Fiesch | 16.12.2009 | 13.10.2013 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Stiftung 'altes Bellwald'
- Stiftung «Altes Bellwald»
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung "altes Bellwald"
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005275966, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Stiftung "altes Bellwald", in Bellwald, CHE-102.014.060, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 97 vom 19.05.2017, S.0, Publ. 3533723).
Domizil neu:
c/o Gemeindeverwaltung, Hauptgasse 1, 3997 Bellwald.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Lambrigger, Georg, von Bellwald, in Bellwald, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten;
Jeiziner, Yvon Bruno, genannt Bruno, von Bellwald, in Bellwald, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Wyden, Michael Albert, von Bellwald, in Bellwald, Vizepräsident des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten];
Holzer, Roger, von Bellwald, in Visp, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten;
Volken, Simon, von Grengiols, in Bellwald, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Publication number: 3533723, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Stiftung 'altes Bellwald', in Bellwald, CHE-102.014.060, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 222 vom 15.11.2013, Publ. 1183581).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Perren, Reinhard, von Bellwald, in Bellwald, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten;
Schmid, Paul, von Bellwald, in Bern, Mitglied und Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten;
Wenger, Johann, genannt Hans, von Bellwald, in Bellwald, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kipfer, Hans Rudolf, von Lützelflüh, in Bellwald, Mitglied und Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten;
Perren-Zufferey, Martin, von Bellwald, in Bellwald, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten;
Wyden, Michael Albert, von Bellwald, in Bellwald, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten.
Publication number: 1183581, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (600)
Berichtigung des im SHAB Nr. 198 vom 14.10.2013, S. 0, publizierten TR-Eintrages Nr. 1309 vom 09.10.2013Stiftung 'altes Bellwald', in Bellwald, CHE-102.014.060, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 198 vom 14.10.2013, Publ. 1126351).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Schmid, Paul, von Bellwald, in Bern, Mitglied und Sekretär, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten [nicht: Schmid, Paul, genannt Hans];
Wenger, Johann, genannt Hans, von Bellwald, in Bellwald, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien mit dem Präsidenten oder dem Vizepräsidenten [nicht: Wenger, Johann]. .
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.