Address
c/o Felix Lehner
Feldstrasse 11
8750 Glarus
Reports for Stiftung A. Affeltranger
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stiftung A. Affeltranger
- Stiftung A. Affeltranger has its legal headquarters in Glarus and is active. It operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management has 4 active persons registered.
- All past changes can be viewed and saved as a PDF under the section «Notifications». The last change in the commercial register was made on 01.07.2024.
- The organization's UID is CHE-110.194.550.
Management (4)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Dagmar Doll-Schütz,
Dr. phil. Martin Beglinger,
Dr. Heinrich Aebli-Kosljuk
newest authorized signatories
Dagmar Doll-Schütz,
Dr. phil. Martin Beglinger,
Dr. Heinrich Aebli-Kosljuk
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
29.01.1966
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
Glarus
Commercial Registry Office
GL
Commercial register number
CH-160.7.002.661-5
UID/VAT
CHE-110.194.550
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Stiftung gewährt Beiträge an die Feiern und Feste in der Weihnachtszeit für die Kinder des Kindergartens Erlen. Bedürftigen reformierten Familien macht sie Geschenke oder wendet Barbeträge zu Weihnachten zu. Letzteres kann sie selber veranlassen oder die entsprechenden Mittel zu diesem Zwecke dem evangelisch-reformierten Pfarramt oder einer Institution der evangelisch-reformierten Kirche oder einer Institution, an welcher diese beteiligt ist, überlassen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
UMBERG TREUHAND AG | Glarus | 01.07.2024 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Bernet & Lehner Treuhand AG | Glarus | 09.05.2018 | 30.06.2024 | |
Felix Lehner | Glarus | 19.01.2009 | 08.05.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stiftung A. Affeltranger
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006071314, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Stiftung A. Affeltranger, in Glarus, CHE-110.194.550, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 121 vom 24.06.2022, Publ. 1005503838).
Domizil neu:
c/o Felix Lehner, Feldstrasse 11, 8750 Glarus.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bernet & Lehner Treuhand AG (CHE-106.897.246), in Glarus, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
UMBERG TREUHAND AG (CHE-106.897.051), in Glarus, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005503838, Commercial Registry Office Glarus
Stiftung A. Affeltranger, in Glarus, CHE-110.194.550, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 89 vom 09.05.2018, Publ. 4220365).
Aufsichtsbehörde neu:
Handelsregister des Kantons Glarus, in Glarus.
Publication number: 4220365, Commercial Registry Office Glarus, (160)
Stiftung A. Affeltranger, in Glarus, CHE-110.194.550, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 185 vom 23.09.2016, Publ. 3071055).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Felix Lehner (CH-160.1.004.882-3), in Glarus, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bernet & Lehner Treuhand AG (CHE-106.897.246), in Glarus, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.