Reports for Sternen Toggenburg AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Sternen Toggenburg AG
- Sternen Toggenburg AG is a Company limited by shares (AG) with its legal headquarters in Unterwasser. Sternen Toggenburg AG belongs to the industry «Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses» and is currently active.
- The management has 4 active persons registered.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 30.12.2021.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-109.086.735.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Felix Senn,
Yvette Françoise Thüring,
Alfonso Marco Waldmeier,
Johann Rudolf Meier
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.06.2001
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Wildhaus-Alt St. Johann
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.3.050.090-7
UID/VAT
CHE-109.086.735
Sector
Operation of hotels, inns and B&B/guesthouses
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Betrieb und Verwaltung von Hotelbetrieben, Restaurationsbetrieben, Unterhaltsbetrieben und Dienstleistungen aller Art in den vorgenannten Bereichen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie, Grundstücke erwerben, halten und veräussern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Streicher & Brotschin Revision AG | Basel | 11.11.2015 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Streicher & Brotschin Unternehmensberatung AG in Liquidation | Scuol | <2004 | 10.11.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Sternen Toggenburg AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005371219, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Sternen Toggenburg AG, in Wildhaus-Alt St. Johann, CHE-109.086.735, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 206 vom 22.10.2020, Publ. 1005005951).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Högger, Roland, von Rapperswil-Jona, in Jona (Rapperswil-Jona), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Senn, Felix, von Glarus, in Alpnach Dorf (Alpnach), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Thüring, Yvette, von Schüpfen, in Basel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005005951, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Sternen Toggenburg AG, in Wildhaus-Alt St. Johann, CHE-109.086.735, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 219 vom 11.11.2015, S.0, Publ. 2475887).
Statutenänderung:
08.08.2013. 14.10.2020.
Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 2'250'000.00 [bisher: CHF 900'000.00].
Liberierung Aktienkapital neu:
CHF 2'250'000.00 [bisher: CHF 900'000.00].
Aktien neu:
9'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00 und 27'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 50.00 [bisher: 9'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 100.00].
Qualifizierte Tatbestände neu:
Verrechnung: Bei der ordentlichen Kapitalerhöhung vom 14.10.2020 wird eine Forderung in der Höhe von CHF 1'350'000.00 verrechnet, wofür 27'000 Namenaktien zu CHF 50.00 ausgegeben werden.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Meier, Johann Rudolf, von Neerach und Turbenthal, in Arlesheim, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Münchenstein];
Waldmeier, Alfonso, von Möhlin, in Rheinsulz (Laufenburg), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien. [Nachtrag (Statutendatum vom 08.08.2013) zum im SHAB Nr. 163 vom 26.08.2013 publizierten TR Eintrag Nr. 8538 vom 21.08.2013].
Publication number: 2475887, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Sternen Toggenburg AG, in Wildhaus-Alt St. Johann, CHE-109.086.735, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 194 vom 08.10.2014, Publ. 1756951).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Streicher & Brotschin Revision und Unternehmensberatung AG, in Basel, Revisionsstelle;
Schneider, Patrick, von Pfäffikon, in Ebnat-Kappel, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Högger, Roland, von Rapperswil-Jona, in Jona (Rapperswil-Jona), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Gossau SG];
Streicher & Brotschin Revision AG (CHE-114.014.919), in Basel, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.