Reports for Stern AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stern AG
- Stern AG has its legal headquarters in Biberist, is active and operates in the sector «Locksmithery, smithy and workshops».
- The management of the company Stern AG, which was founded on the 08.05.2007, consists of 2 persons.
- On the 04.05.2017 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Stern AG is the following: CHE-113.619.190.
- Companies with an identical address: Group Fitness GmbH, Mythentec AG, Stryker-Osteonics AG.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.05.2007
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Biberist
Commercial Registry Office
SO
Commercial register number
CH-241.3.006.639-6
UID/VAT
CHE-113.619.190
Sector
Locksmithery, smithy and workshops
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Herstellung von technischen Komponenten. Kann Liegenschaften erwerben, verwalten und veräussern, im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen errichten, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder errichten sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit in Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Heri Edmund | Biberist | 15.05.2007 | 27.02.2011 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stern AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 3502825, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Stern AG, in Solothurn, CHE-113.619.190, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 114 vom 14.06.2012, Publ. 6718988).
Statutenänderung:
27.04.2017.
Sitz neu:
Biberist.
Domizil neu:
Burgunderstrasse 13, 4562 Biberist.
Publication number: 6718988, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Stern AG, in Lohn-Ammannsegg, CH-241.3.006.639-6, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 41 vom 28.02.2011, S. 13, Publ. 6052092).
Statutenänderung:
08.06.2012.
Sitz neu:
Solothurn.
Domizil neu:
Roamerstrasse 2, 4500 Solothurn.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stern, Paul, von Lohn SO, in Lohn-Ammannsegg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Stern-Arni, Alice, von Bibern SO, Lohn SO und Rüti bei Riggisberg, in Lohn-Ammannsegg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Stern, Martin, von Rüti bei Riggisberg, in Oekingen, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Stern, André, von Rüti bei Riggisberg, in Zuchwil, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Publication number: 6052092, Commercial Registry Office Solothurn, (241)
Stern AG, in Lohn-Ammannsegg, CH-241.3.006.639-6, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 93 vom 15.05.2007, S. 12, Publ. 3931616).
Statutenänderung:
14.02.2011. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.]. Mit Erklärung vom 14.02.2011 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Edmund Heri, in Biberist, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.