Reports for Stähli AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stähli AG
- Stähli AG with its legal headquarters in Uetendorf is active. Stähli AG operates in the sector «Trading in consumer goods».
- The company was founded on 05.06.1942.
- The company has last changed their commercial register entry on 03.08.2023, under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The company's UID is CHE-107.229.314.
- e-Framer AG, Turnsportzentrum Berner Oberland AG are registered at the same address.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Thomas Klaus Just,
Olivier Bachmann,
Nicole Schmid,
René Häsler,
Dr. Martin Hermann Bär
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
05.06.1942
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Uetendorf
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.008.075-8
UID/VAT
CHE-107.229.314
Sector
Trading in consumer goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt den Handel en gros mit Fahrzeugen und Zubehör. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen des In- und Auslandes beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke, Wertschriften, Patente und andere Schutzrechte erwerben der weiterveräussern, sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (4)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Gfeller + Partner AG | Bern | 23.04.2021 | 02.08.2023 | |
Burri Treuhand Schüpfen GmbH | Schüpfen | 10.11.2015 | 22.04.2021 | |
Kämpf & Stauffer Treuhand AG | Interlaken | 27.04.2010 | 09.11.2015 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stähli AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005809061, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stähli AG, in Uetendorf, CHE-107.229.314, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 114 vom 15.06.2023, Publ. 1005769013). Gemäss Erklärung vom 26.06.2023 wurde auf die eingeschränkte Revision verzichtet.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bieri, Thomas, von Schangnau, in Steffisburg, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gfeller + Partner AG (CHE-151.579.083), in Bern, Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Bachmann, Olivier, von Langnau im Emmental, in Nidau, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Just, Thomas Klaus, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Trimstein (Münsingen), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005769013, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stähli AG, in Uetendorf, CHE-107.229.314, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 204 vom 20.10.2022, Publ. 1005587283).
Fusion:
Übernahme der Aktiven und Passiven der Frame Group AG, in Uetendorf (CHE-436.210.672), gemäss Fusionsvertrag vom 08.06.2023 und Bilanz per 31.12.2022. Aktiven von CHF 677'377.50 und Passiven (Fremdkapital) von CHF 810'528.78, d.h. ein Passivenüberschuss von CHF 133'151.28, gehen auf die übernehmende Gesellschaft über. Die übernehmende Gesellschaft verfügt gemäss Bestätigung der zugelassenen Revisionsexpertin über frei verwendbares Eigenkapital im Umfang der Unterdeckung und der Überschuldung. Da dieselbe Aktionärin sämtliche Aktien der an der Fusion beteiligten Gesellschaften hält, findet weder eine Kapitalerhöhung noch eine Aktienzuteilung statt.
Publication number: HR02-1005587283, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Stähli AG, in Uetendorf, CHE-107.229.314, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 40 vom 25.02.2022, Publ. 1005414389).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Steiner, Thomas, von Langnau im Emmental, in Ersigen, Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Häsler, René, von Gsteigwiler, in Faulensee (Spiez), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Bär, Martin, von Rifferswil, in Faulensee (Spiez), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.