Reports for Stabi GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Stabi GmbH
- Stabi GmbH has its legal headquarters in Vilters and is active. It is a Limited liability company and active in the industry «Production of metal goods».
- The management of the company Stabi GmbH, which was founded on the 30.07.2002, consists of 3 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 04.02.2019.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Stabi GmbH is the following: CHE-109.679.295.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.07.2002
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Vilters-Wangs
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.4.052.004-0
UID/VAT
CHE-109.679.295
Sector
Production of metal goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Apparatebau. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen oder sich mit diesen zusammenschliessen sowie Grundstücke im In- und Ausland erwerben, verkaufen, vermieten oder verwalten.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Stabi GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1004557705, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Stabi GmbH, in Vilters-Wangs, CHE-109.679.295, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 97 vom 21.05.2012, Publ. 6685598).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gianutt, Sonja, von Seewis im Prättigau, in Sargans, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00;
Gianutt, Michael, von Seewis im Prättigau, in Sargans, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 5'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
ODT GmbH (CHE-114.638.675), in Bilten (Glarus Nord), Gesellschafterin, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 5'000.00 und mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00;
Eberle, Fridolin, von Flums, in Bad Ragaz, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Dürr, Oliver, von Gams, in Tscherlach (Walenstadt), mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: 6685598, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Stabi GmbH, in Vilters-Wangs, CH-320.4.052.004-0, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 61 vom 29.03.2010, S. 16, Publ. 5562476).
Domizil neu:
Härtistrasse 60, 7324 Vilters.
Publication number: 5562476, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
Stabi GmbH, in Vilters-Wangs, CH-320.4.052.004-0, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 113 vom 14.06.2005, S. 12, Publ. 2880968). Gemäss Erklärung der Geschäftsführung vom 02.03.2010 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Gianutt, Albert, von Seewis im Prättigau, in Sargans, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00;
Gianutt-Heinzer, Klara, von Seewis im Prättigau, in Sargans, Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 5'000.00;
Gianutt, Marco, von Seewis im Prättigau, in Sargans, Geschäftsführer, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Gianutt-Guntli, Karin, von Vilters-Wangs und Seewis im Prättigau, in Vilters (Vilters-Wangs), Gesellschafterin, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 5'000.00.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Gianutt, Sonja, von Seewis im Prättigau, in Sargans, Gesellschafterin und Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift, mit einem Stammanteil von CHF 10'000.00;
Gianutt, Michael, von Seewis im Prättigau, in Sargans, Gesellschafter, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung, mit 2 Stammanteilen zu je CHF 5'000.00.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.