Reports for Sportzentrum Grindelwald AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Sportzentrum Grindelwald AG
- Sportzentrum Grindelwald AG in Grindelwald is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Sport services». Sportzentrum Grindelwald AG is active.
- The management consists of 8 persons. The company was founded on 30.04.1974.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 29.05.2024.
- The reported UID is CHE-103.934.980.
- There are 4 other active companies registered at the same address. These include: BauSpektrum AG Grindelwald, BauSpektrum GROUP AG Grindelwald, BauSpektrum HOLDING AG Grindelwald.
Management (8)
newest board members
Christoph Schmid,
Daniel Graf,
Beat Bucher,
Niels Friedrich Buri,
Barbara Hofer-Gerber
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.04.1974
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Grindelwald
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.005.191-3
UID/VAT
CHE-103.934.980
Sector
Sport services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist der Bau und Betrieb von Sportanlagen und Kurortseinrichtungen aller Art für die einheimische Bevölkerung und die Gäste. Die Gesellschaft ist befugt, für die Erfüllung ihres Zweckes Liegenschaften oder Baurechte zu erwerben und sonst alles zu tun, was der Erfüllung ihres Zweckes dient.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Lehmann + Bacher Treuhand AG | Meiringen | <2004 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Sportzentrum Grindelwald AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006042337, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Sportzentrum Grindelwald AG, in Grindelwald, CHE-103.934.980, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 80 vom 25.04.2024, Publ. 1006017473).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kräutl, Andreas, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Grindelwald, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Chur].
Publication number: HR02-1006017473, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Sportzentrum Grindelwald AG, in Grindelwald, CHE-103.934.980, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 189 vom 29.09.2023, Publ. 1005848476).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stock, Sebastian, von Arlesheim, in Bönigen b. Interlaken (Bönigen), Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Kräutl, Andreas, österreichischer Staatsangehöriger, in Chur, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005848476, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
Sportzentrum Grindelwald AG, in Grindelwald, CHE-103.934.980, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 131 vom 08.07.2022, Publ. 1005516139).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Grossniklaus, Stefan, von Beatenberg, in Grindelwald, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Graf, Daniel, von Lauterbrunnen, in Grindelwald, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Hofer, Barbara, von Schangnau, in Grindelwald, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung;
Schmid, Christoph, von Klosters, in Grindelwald, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.