Reports for Spinnler Bau AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Spinnler Bau AG
- Spinnler Bau AG with its legal headquarters in Seltisberg is active. Spinnler Bau AG operates in the sector «General structural engineering».
- The management has 3 active persons registered.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 03.04.2018.
- The company is registered in the commercial register BL under the UID CHE-112.420.154.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
28.06.2005
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Seltisberg
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.3.008.771-2
UID/VAT
CHE-112.420.154
Sector
General structural engineering
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Hoch- und Tiefbau, Handel mit Baumaterialien sowie Beton bohren und fräsen. Die Gesellschaft kann sich in jeder Form an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, die mit dem Gesellschaftszweck in Zusammenhang stehen sowie Grundeigentum veräussern und erwerben.
Auditor
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Bruno Recher, Treuhand- und Revisionsbüro | Ziefen | 04.07.2005 | 28.06.2009 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Spinnler Bau AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: 4145935, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Spinnler Bau AG, in Seltisberg, CHE-112.420.154, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 122 vom 29.06.2009, Publ. 5097396).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Spinnler-Burri, Susanne, von Seltisberg, in Seltisberg, Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Spinnler-Burri, Urs, von Seltisberg, in Seltisberg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Spinnler, Andreas, von Seltisberg, in Seltisberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Spinnler, Thomas, von Seltisberg, in Liestal, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Publication number: 5097396, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Spinnler Bau AG, in Seltisberg, CH-280.3.008.771-2, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 127 vom 04.07.2005, S. 7, Publ. 2913018).
Statutenänderung:
22.06.2009. [Die publikationspflichtigen Tatsachen haben keine Änderung erfahren.]. Gemäss Erklärung des Verwaltungsrates vom 22.06.2009 untersteht die Gesellschaft keiner ordentlichen Revision und verzichtet auf eine eingeschränkte Revision.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Bruno Recher, Treuhand- und Revisionsbüro, in Ziefen, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: 2913018, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Spinnler Bau AG, in Seltisberg, CH-280.3.008.771-2, Im Hof 8, 4411 Seltisberg, Aktiengesellschaft (Neueintragung).
Statutendatum:
22.06.2005.
Zweck:
Hoch- und Tiefbau, Handel mit Baumaterialien sowie Beton bohren und fräsen. Die Gesellschaft kann sich in jeder Form an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen, die mit dem Gesellschaftszweck in Zusammenhang stehen sowie Grundeigentum veräussern und erwerben.
Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.--.
Liberierung Aktienkapital:
CHF 100'000.--.
Aktien:
100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.--.
Qualifizierte Tatbestände:
Sacheinlage/Sachübernahme: Die Gesellschaft übernimmt bei der Gründung das Geschäft der Einzelfirma 'U. Spinnler', in Seltisberg (CH-280.1.911.159-6), gemäss Vertrag vom 22.06.2005 und Bilanz per 31.12.2004 mit Aktiven von CHF 194'248.56 und Passiven von CHF 76'883.85, wofür 100 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.-- ausgegeben und CHF 17'364.71 als Forderung gutgeschrieben werden.
Publikationsorgan:
SHAB. Die Mitteilungen der Gesellschaft an die Aktionäre erfolgen durch eingeschriebenen Brief.
Eingetragene Personen:
Spinnler-Burri, Urs, von Seltisberg, in Seltisberg, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Spinnler-Burri, Susanne, von Seltisberg, in Seltisberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Spinnler, Thomas, von Seltisberg, in Liestal, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Spinnler, Andreas, von Seltisberg, in Seltisberg, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Bruno Recher, Treuhand- und Revisionsbüro, in Ziefen, Revisionsstelle.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.