Reports for Spectroplast AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Spectroplast AG
- Spectroplast AG has its legal headquarters in Schlieren, is active and operates in the sector «Manufacturing of rubber and plastic products».
- The management of the company Spectroplast AG consists of 5 persons.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 12.09.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company is registered in the commercial register ZH under the UID CHE-427.587.592.
- Next to the company Spectroplast AG there are 9 other active companies with an identical address. These include: ACE Speditions AG, Alexander Keller AG, Avelo AG.
Management (5)
newest board members
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Dr. Pablo Hafner,
Prof. Dr. Jürgen Stampfl,
Andreas Bertsch,
Michael Rösli,
Lucas Oehms
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.09.2018
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Schlieren
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.046.463-9
UID/VAT
CHE-427.587.592
Sector
Manufacturing of rubber and plastic products
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bietet additive Fertigungslösungen für elastomere Werkstoffe wie Silikone und Polyurethane an. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Tochtergesellschaften und Zweigniederlassungen errichten und sich im In- und Ausland an anderen Unternehmen beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft kann Grundstücke und Immaterialgüterrechte erwerben, halten und veräussern. Die Gesellschaft kann auch alle kommerziellen, finanziellen und anderen Tätigkeiten ausüben, welche mit dem Zweck der Gesellschaft direkt oder indirekt im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Frehner Treuhand AG | Stäfa | 08.04.2022 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Spectroplast AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006127750, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Spectroplast AG, in Schlieren, CHE-427.587.592, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 149 vom 05.08.2024, Publ. 1006099525).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Christen, Benjamin, von Wolfenschiessen, in Alpnach, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006099525, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Spectroplast AG, in Schlieren, CHE-427.587.592, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 129 vom 05.07.2024, Publ. 1006076579).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Feigl, John Martin, von Fischingen, in Nürensdorf, Direktor, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Gürsoy, Akin, türkischer Staatsangehöriger, in Winterthur, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Mäder, Luis Dario, von Basel, in Männedorf, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1006076579, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
Spectroplast AG, in Schlieren, CHE-427.587.592, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 92 vom 14.05.2024, Publ. 1006031048).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hafner, Pablo, von Dinhard, in Walchwil, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.