Reports for Sonnenhof-Hilfsverein
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Sonnenhof-Hilfsverein
- Sonnenhof-Hilfsverein has its legal headquarters in Arlesheim and is active. It operates in the sector «Religious, political or secular associations».
- The management has 4 active persons registered.
- The most recent commercial register change was made on 21.11.2022. You can find all changes under «Notifications».
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the organization Sonnenhof-Hilfsverein is the following: CHE-104.211.683.
- Next to the organization Sonnenhof-Hilfsverein there are 2 other active companies with an identical address. These include: Gemeinschaftsstiftung Klinisch-Therapeutisches Institut, Sonnenhof Arlesheim AG.
Management (4)
newest members of the committee
Barbara Candeias Valente Morais,
Frieder Joachim Recht,
Thomas Schneeberger,
Jacqueline Schmid
newest authorized signatories
Barbara Candeias Valente Morais,
Frieder Joachim Recht,
Thomas Schneeberger,
Jacqueline Schmid
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
12.10.1955
Legal form
Association
Legal headquarters of the company
Arlesheim
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.6.911.817-3
UID/VAT
CHE-104.211.683
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Wirtschaftliche Förderung der Sonnenhof Arlesheim AG, Zentrum für Menschen mit Behinderung, durch Sammlung von Spenden und Entgegennahme von Legaten, Zuwendungen und Vermächtnissen. Aus freien Mitteln können bei aussergewöhnlichen Bedürfnissen auch auch andere verwandte und gemeinnützige Initiativen und Projekte unterstützt werden; Hilfen für Betreute jeden Alters; Abschlüsse von Darlehens- und Verpfründungsverträgen.
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Sonnenhof-Hilfsverein
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005608924, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Sonnenhof-Hilfsverein, in Arlesheim, CHE-104.211.683, Verein (SHAB Nr. 139 vom 22.07.2019, Publ. 1004681158).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Högsberg, Christian Valentin, von Dornach, in Dornach, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Candeias Valente Morais, Barbara, portugiesische Staatsangehörige, in Waldenburg, Präsidentin des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Recht, Frieder, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Ettingen, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004681158, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Sonnenhof-Hilfsverein, in Arlesheim, CHE-104.211.683, Verein (SHAB Nr. 99 vom 23.05.2019, Publ. 1004636784).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wüest, Charles, von Arlesheim, in Arlesheim, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004636784, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
Sonnenhof-Hilfsverein, in Arlesheim, CHE-104.211.683, Verein (SHAB Nr. 144 vom 27.07.2016, Publ. 2976395).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Hottinger, Niklaus, von Basel, in Zwingen, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Högsberg, Christian Valentin, von Dornach, in Dornach, Präsident des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: in Basel, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Candeias Valente Morais, Barbara, portugiesische Staatsangehörige, in Waldenburg, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Schmid, Jacqueline, von Niedermuhlern und Erschwil, in Duggingen, Mitglied des Vorstandes, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: von Erschwil und Niedermuhlern, in Aesch (BL)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.