Reports for SOMENA Holding AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SOMENA Holding AG
- SOMENA Holding AG has its legal headquarters in Baar and is active. It operates in the sector «Operation of investment companies».
- The management of the company SOMENA Holding AG consists of 5 persons. The foundation of the company took place on 30.01.2019.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 07.12.2022.
- SOMENA Holding AG is registered in the Canton of ZG under the UID CHE-430.107.515.
- On the same address there are 48 other active companies registered. These include: Aldo Global Services GmbH, Aldo Group International GmbH, Algorithmic Security GmbH.
Management (5)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Rico Stüdli,
Stefan Remo Mayer,
Hermann Hess,
Klaus Martin Morlock,
Peter Lenz
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
30.01.2019
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Baar
Commercial Registry Office
ZG
Commercial register number
CH-170.3.043.235-1
UID/VAT
CHE-430.107.515
CHE-116.329.423 VAT
Sector
Operation of investment companies
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Erwerb, Halten, Verwalten und Veräussern von Beteiligungen an anderen Unternehmungen im In- und Ausland sowie Erwerb, Halten, Verwalten und Veräussern von Gewerbeimmobilien im In- und Ausland; vollständige Zweckumschreibung gemäss Statuten.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PROVIDA Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | St. Gallen | 14.01.2022 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Examina AG | Küsnacht (ZH) | 04.02.2019 | 13.01.2022 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- SOMENA Holding SA
- SOMENA Holding Ltd
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SOMENA Holding AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005622041, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
SOMENA Holding AG, in Baar, CHE-430.107.515, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 10 vom 14.01.2022, Publ. 1005380981).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Mayer, Stefan, von Lommis, in Amriswil, Prokurist, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien;
Stüdli, Rico, von Flawil, in Frauenfeld, Prokurist, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005380981, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
SOMENA Holding AG, in Baar, CHE-430.107.515, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 251 vom 24.12.2021, Publ. 1005366996).
Domizil neu:
Schochenmühlestrasse 6, 6340 Baar.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Examina AG (CHE-116.264.605), in Küsnacht (ZH), Revisionsstelle.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
PROVIDA Wirtschaftsprüfung AG (CHE-106.067.173), in St. Gallen, Revisionsstelle.
Publication number: HR02-1005366996, Commercial Registry Office Zug, (170)
SOMENA Holding AG, in Baar, CHE-430.107.515, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 75 vom 20.04.2021, Publ. 1005153759).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Schreiner, Andreas, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wiesbaden (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Vogel, Dr. Manuel, von Zürich und Luzern, in Risch, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Hess, Hermann, von Amriswil, in Amriswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Lenz, Peter, von Uesslingen-Buch, in Sirnach, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Morlock, Klaus, von Zürich, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.