Reports for Solexis SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Solexis SA
- Solexis SA in Sierre is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Trading with machines». Solexis SA is active.
- The management of the company Solexis SA consists of one person.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 05.12.2023. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The UID registered in the commercial register of VS is CHE-115.580.630.
- The company Solexis SA has currently registered 3 different trademarks or applications for trademarks.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
08.04.2010
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sierre
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.3.012.818-8
UID/VAT
CHE-115.580.630
Sector
Trading with machines
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
La diffusion et le commerce de matériel technique, composants et systèmes en relation avec les économies d'énergie et la production d'énergies renouvelables, ainsi que la provision de services d'expertises, de conseils, d'études, d'ingénierie, et de formation y relatifs (cf. statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ofisa Berney Associés SA | Lausanne | 26.04.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Quadis Revisionen GmbH | Leuk | 22.03.2022 | 25.04.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
15.07.2024 | active | 06723/2024 | |
06.06.2024 | active | 06324/2024 |
Newest SOGC notifications: Solexis SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005901757, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Solexis SA, à Sierre, CHE-115.580.630, société anonyme (No. FOSC 80 du 26.04.2023, Publ. 1005732900).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Chiariny, Jean-Guilhem, ressortissant français, à Clarens (Montreux), administrateur, sans droit de signature;
Conne, Olivier, de Chexbres, à Chardonne, administrateur, sans droit de signature;
Mittaz, Eric, de Chermignon, à Chermignon, administrateur, sans droit de signature.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Bichsel, Frédéric, de Genève, à Bonvillars, administrateur, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: président, avec signature individuelle].
Publication number: HR02-1005732900, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Solexis SA, à Sierre, CHE-115.580.630, société anonyme (No. FOSC 236 du 05.12.2022, Publ. 1005619999).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Tosi, Christophe, de Winznau, à Sierre, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux;
Quadis Revisionen GmbH (CHE-485.142.969), à Leuk, organe de révision.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Bichsel, Frédéric, de Genève, à Bonvillars, président, avec signature individuelle [précédemment: président, avec signature collective à deux];
Ofisa Berney Associés SA (CHE-105.764.401), à Lausanne, organe de révision.
Publication number: HR02-1005619999, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Solexis SA, à Sierre, CHE-115.580.630, société anonyme (No. FOSC 57 du 22.03.2022, Publ. 1005433047).
Modification des statuts:
24.11.2022.
Nouvelle adresse:
Route du Bois de Finges 21, 3960 Sierre.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Bichsel, Frédéric, de Genève, à Bonvillars, président, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: à Chamblon]. [Modification des statuts sur des points non soumis à publication].