Reports for Société des sources de Champéry SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Société des sources de Champéry SA
- Société des sources de Champéry SA with its legal headquarters in Champéry is active. Société des sources de Champéry SA operates in the sector «Water and sewage utilities».
- The company was founded on 22.11.1900.
- The commercial register entry of the company was last modified on 17.06.2024. Under «Notifications» it is possible to view all previous changes.
- The company Société des sources de Champéry SA is registered under the UID CHE-107.775.999.
Management (5)
newest board members
Bernard Passaquay,
Laurent Nicod,
Alexis Pierre Gex-Collet,
Noémie Anne Exhenry,
Paul Daniel Michellod
newest authorized signatories
Bernard Passaquay,
Laurent Nicod,
Alexis Pierre Gex-Collet,
Noémie Anne Exhenry,
Paul Daniel Michellod
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.11.1900
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Champéry
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-621.3.001.066-8
UID/VAT
CHE-107.775.999
Sector
Water and sewage utilities
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation des sources de la Laitière et autres, dont elle est propriétaire, pour y être exploitées comme eaux alimentaires, eaux industrielles et auprès des tiers (cf statuts pour but complet).
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fiduciaire FIDAG SA | Martigny | 07.09.2006 | 03.09.2017 | |
Fiduciaire Actis SA | Sion | <2004 | 06.09.2006 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- La Société des Eaux de Champéry SA
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Société des sources de Champéry SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006059097, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Société des sources de Champéry SA, à Champéry, CHE-107.775.999, société anonyme (No. FOSC 186 du 26.09.2022, Publ. 1005569260).
Nouvelle adresse:
Route de la Fin 11, 1874 Champéry.
Autre adresse:
c/o Bernard Passaquay, Route du Montet 26, 1871 Choëx. [biffé: c/o La Vièze Fiduciaire SA, Route de Montet 26, 1871 Choëx].
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Avanthay, Christian, de Val-d'Illiez, à Val-d'Illiez, directeur, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005569260, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Société des sources de Champéry SA, à Champéry, CHE-107.775.999, société anonyme (No. FOSC 123 du 28.06.2018, Publ. 4322567).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Exhenry, Pierre-Ignace, de Champéry, à Champéry, président, avec signature collective à deux;
Fellay, Luc, de Bagnes, à Champéry, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux;
Gex-Collet, Jean-Claude, de Champéry, à Champéry, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Nicod, Laurent, de Assens, à Monthey, président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: de Malapalud, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux];
Passaquay, Bernard, de Saint-Maurice, à Monthey, vice-président du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur, avec signature collective à deux];
Exhenry, Noémie Anne, de Champéry, à Val-d'Illiez, administratrice, avec signature collective à deux;
Gex-Collet, Alexis Pierre, de Champéry, à Val-d'Illiez, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux;
Michellod, Paul Daniel, de Leytron, à Leytron, administrateur, avec signature collective à deux.
Publication number: 4322567, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (621)
Société des sources de Champéry SA, à Champéry, CHE-107.775.999, société anonyme (No. FOSC 170 du 04.09.2017, Publ. 3731629).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Milicevic, Raffael, de Le Lieu, à Troistorrents, directeur, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Avanthay, Christian, de Val-d'Illiez, à Val-d'Illiez, directeur, avec signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.