Address
c/o Paul Schnidrig
Rue de Gravelone 38
1950 Sion
Reports for Société de Promotion des Restoroutes Valaisans SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Société de Promotion des Restoroutes Valaisans SA
- Société de Promotion des Restoroutes Valaisans SA with its legal headquarters in Sion is active. Société de Promotion des Restoroutes Valaisans SA operates in the sector «Advertising services».
- The management of the company Société de Promotion des Restoroutes Valaisans SA, which was founded on the 10.02.1987, consists of 8 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 29.04.2022.
- The reported UID is CHE-100.782.509.
Management (8)
newest board members
Christian Carron,
Stève Mottiez,
Sylvie Maude Luginbühl,
Paul Schnidrig,
Hubert Gattlen
newest authorized signatories
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
10.02.1987
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Sion
Commercial Registry Office
VS
Commercial register number
CH-626.3.001.847-3
UID/VAT
CHE-100.782.509
Sector
Advertising services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Construction et exploitation des places de ravitaillement le long des routes nationales en Valais; gestion des installations destinées au ravitaillement et à la restauration telles que kiosques, véhicules de marchands ambulants ou stands de vente; information et promotion du canton le long des autoroutes, etc.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Inspection des finances du canton du Valais | Sion | 23.02.2010 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Société de Promotion des Restoroutes Valaisans
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Société de Promotion des Restoroutes Valaisans SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005461993, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Société de Promotion des Restoroutes Valaisans SA, à Sion, CHE-100.782.509, société anonyme (No. FOSC 217 du 06.11.2020, Publ. 1005017477).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Smith, Christine , de Zumikon, à Liddes, administratrice, sans droit de signature.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Carron, Christian, de Fully, à Fully, administrateur, sans droit de signature.
Publication number: HR02-1005017477, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Société de Promotion des Restoroutes Valaisans SA, à Sion, CHE-100.782.509, société anonyme (No. FOSC 60 du 27.03.2018, Publ. 4137385).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Délétroz, Clément, de Ayent, à Ayent, administrateur, sans droit de signature;
Ruppen, Anton, de Stalden VS, à Sion, administrateur, sans droit de signature.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Mottiez, Stève, de Vérossaz, à Collonges, administrateur, sans droit de signature;
Smith, Christine , de Zumikon, à Liddes, administratrice, sans droit de signature.
Publication number: 4137385, Commercial Registry Office Valais, (626)
Société de Promotion des Restoroutes Valaisans SA, à Sion, CHE-100.782.509, société anonyme (No. FOSC 6 du 10.01.2017, Publ. 3274021).
Personne(s) et signature(s) radiée(s):
Couchepin Vouilloz, Anne-Laure, de Martigny, à Martigny, vice-présidente, avec signature collective à deux.
Inscription ou modification de personne(s):
Luginbühl, Sylvie, de Bowil, à Martigny, vice-présidente du conseil d'administration, avec signature collective à deux;
Délétroz, Clément, de Ayent, à Ayent, administrateur, sans droit de signature;
Sottas, Jean-Louis, de Pont-en-Ogoz, à Meyriez, secrétaire (hors-conseil), avec signature collective à deux [précédemment: administrateur, secrétaire, avec signature collective à deux].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.