Reports for Socar Research SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout Socar Research SA
- Socar Research SA with its legal headquarters in Nyon is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Research and development». Socar Research SA is active.
- The management consists of one person. The company was founded on 22.11.1994.
- The last commercial register change was made on 31.05.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The Enterprise Identification Number of the company Socar Research SA is the following: CHE-107.681.536.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
22.11.1994
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Nyon
Commercial Registry Office
VD
Commercial register number
CH-550.0.096.354-8
UID/VAT
CHE-107.681.536
Sector
Research and development
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exécution, coordination et surveillance de recherches cliniques et pharmaceutiques dans le domaine médical; développement, gestion et commercialisation de systèmes et techniques de gestion de bases de données; conseils et services d'expert; organisation de congrès et symposiums scientifiques.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
GiRéFid SA | Cossonay | 31.05.2023 |
Former auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ofisa Berney Associés SA | Lausanne | <2004 | 30.05.2023 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: Socar Research SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005757296, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Socar Research S.A., à Nyon, CHE-107.681.536 (FOSC du 10.02.2022, p. 0/1005402660). Ofisa Berney Associés SA (CHE-105.764.401) n'est plus organe de révision.
Nouvel organe de révision:
GiRéFid SA (CHE-130.217.987), à Cossonay.
Publication number: HR02-1005402660, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Socar Research S.A., à Nyon, CHE-107.681.536 (FOSC du 19.12.2013, p. 0/7225834). Ofisa SA (CH-550-0067334-5), dont le numéro d'identification est (CHE-105.764.401), a modifié sa raison de commerce en Ofisa Berney Associés SA (CHE-105.764.401).
Publication number: 1080961, Commercial Registry Office Vaud, (550)
Socar Research S.A., à Nyon, CH-550-0096354-8 (FOSC du 31.05.2011, p. 0/6187002). van Dalen Fred n'est plus administrateur;
sa signature est radiée. Kirwan Bridget-Anne est maintenant administratrice unique et signe désormais individuellement.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.