Reports for SMAP GmbH
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SMAP GmbH
- SMAP GmbH has its legal headquarters in Aesch BL, is active and operates in the sector «Sport services».
- The management of the company SMAP GmbH consists of 4 persons.
- All modifications to the commercial register entry can be found under «Notifications». The most recent modification was made on 14.04.2023.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-216.229.609.
Management (4)
Executive board
newest authorized signatories
Fabio Back,
Matthias Charles Eduard Preiswerk,
Dr. Bernhard Matthias Heusler,
Dr. Marc Guido Willi Troxler
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.04.2019
Legal form
Limited liability company
Legal headquarters of the company
Aesch (BL)
Commercial Registry Office
BL
Commercial register number
CH-280.4.023.396-2
UID/VAT
CHE-216.229.609
Sector
Sport services
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Durchführung, Organisation und Leitung des Volleyballbetriebes der leistungsorientierten Damen-, Juniorinnen- und Jugendteams des Vereins "Volleyballclub Sm'Aesch Pfeffingen" inklusive Durchführung der Spiele und Abwicklung des Transferwesens sowie der Förderung des Damen-Volleyball als Leistungssport. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundstücke erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte abgeben.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Copartner Revision AG | Basel | 29.04.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SMAP GmbH
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005724036, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
SMAP GmbH, in Aesch (BL), CHE-216.229.609, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 88 vom 06.05.2022, Publ. 1005467178).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Urrea-Principalli, Andrea, von Ettingen, in Basel, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift;
Eichenberger, Bernhard, von Landiswil, in Aesch (BL), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005467178, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
SMAP GmbH, in Aesch (BL), CHE-216.229.609, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 44 vom 04.03.2021, Publ. 1005115496).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Tschopp, Laura, von Ziefen, in Basel, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Urrea-Principalli, Andrea, von Ettingen, in Basel, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005115496, Commercial Registry Office Basel-Landschaft, (280)
SMAP GmbH, in Aesch (BL), CHE-216.229.609, Gesellschaft mit beschränkter Haftung (SHAB Nr. 115 vom 17.06.2020, Publ. 1004912688).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Keller, Esther Christine, von Kirchberg (SG), in Basel, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Tschopp, Laura, von Ziefen, in Basel, Geschäftsführerin, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.