Reports for SKW AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SKW AG
- SKW AG has its legal headquarters in Bubikon, is active and operates in the sector «Gardening and landscaping».
- The management of the company SKW AG consists of 5 persons.
- The company has last modified its commercial register entry on 06.06.2024. All previous commercial register entries are available under «Notifications».
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-255.891.746.
Management (5)
newest board members
Katharina Keller,
Tizian Tobias Frey,
Kathrin Zuber,
Alexander Johannes Hugi,
Samuel Mathias Schmid
newest authorized signatories
Katharina Keller,
Tizian Tobias Frey,
Kathrin Zuber,
Alexander Johannes Hugi,
Samuel Mathias Schmid
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
27.06.2019
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Bubikon
Commercial Registry Office
ZH
Commercial register number
CH-020.3.047.514-1
UID/VAT
CHE-255.891.746
Sector
Gardening and landscaping
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Gestaltung und Pflege sowie die Beratung und Planung von naturnahen Gartenanlagen, Lebensräumen und Standorten (Spezialgebiete sind standortgerechte Begrünungen aller Art, besonders Fassaden- und Dachbegrünungen, Massnahmen in Naturschutzgebieten sowie im Bereich der Ingenieurbiologie und Obstgartenbewirtschaftung); die Ausbildung in allen oben genannten Fachgebieten sowie die aktive Förderung der Idee des naturnahen Siedlungs- und Kulturraumes. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen sowie alle Geschäfte tätigen, die direkt oder indirekt mit ihrem Zweck in Zusammenhang stehen. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum erwerben, belasten, veräussern und verwalten. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Sicherheiten für Verbindlichkeiten verbundener Gesellschaften abgeben.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
PROVIDA Wirtschaftsprüfung AG | St. Gallen | 02.07.2019 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SKW AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1006049279, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
SKW AG, in Bubikon, CHE-255.891.746, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 85 vom 03.05.2023, Publ. 1005737509).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Treichler, Daniel Paul, von Wädenswil, in Wädenswil, Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Keller, Katharina, von Amriswil, in Zürich, Präsidentin des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005737509, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
SKW AG, in Bubikon, CHE-255.891.746, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 164 vom 25.08.2022, Publ. 1005547227).
Weitere Adressen:
Witikonerstrasse 59a, 8032 Zürich [bisher: Spechtweg 3, 8032 Zürich].
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Keller, Katharina, von Amriswil, in Zürich, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, Mitglied der Geschäftsleitung, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005547227, Commercial Registry Office Zurich, (20)
SKW AG, in Bubikon, CHE-255.891.746, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 77 vom 21.04.2022, Publ. 1005454907).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Kreiner, Daniel, von Zollikon, in Grüningen, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Frey, Tizian Tobias, von Densbüren, in Bäretswil, Vizepräsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Zuber, Kathrin, von Günsberg, in Rapperswil-Jona, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.