Address
St.Leonhard-Strasse, Benevolpark
9001 St. Gallen
Reports for skat foundation
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout skat foundation
- skat foundation in St. Gallen is a Foundation from the sector «Religious, political or secular associations». skat foundation is active.
- The management of the organization skat foundation, which was founded on the 17.12.2002, consists of 9 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you will find all commercial register changes, the most recent one was made on 07.02.2024.
- The organization is registered in the commercial register SG under the UID CHE-109.988.738.
Management (9)
newest members of the Foundation Board
Prof. Dr. Yvette Sanchez Erb,
Esther Haldimann,
Dr. Rolf Leutert,
Prof. Dr. Georg Fredrik von Krogh,
Dr. Xaver Edelmann
newest authorized signatories
Andrea Güpfert,
Prof. Dr. Yvette Sanchez Erb,
Matthias Saladin,
Bertha Camacho Tuckermann,
Dr. Rolf Leutert
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
17.12.2002
Legal form
Foundation
Legal headquarters of the company
St. Gallen
Commercial Registry Office
SG
Commercial register number
CH-320.7.052.551-3
UID/VAT
CHE-109.988.738
Sector
Religious, political or secular associations
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Förderung einer nachhaltigen Entwicklung zur Verbesserung der Lebensbedingungen benachteiligter Bevölkerungsgruppen vor allem in Entwicklungs- und Transitionsländern, Durchführung von Forschungs- und Technologieentwicklungsvorhaben, gemeinsames Lernen und gezielte Weitergabe gemachter Erkenntnisse mit dem Bestreben, Wissen zu mehren, verfügbar zu machen und die Partner zu stärken.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Treviso Revisions AG | St. Gallen | 24.12.2020 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Dr. Rietmann & Partner AG, Wirtschaftsprüfer und Steuerberater | St. Gallen | 11.10.2018 | 23.12.2020 | |
TREHAG Treuhand St. Gallen AG | St. Gallen | 11.03.2009 | 10.10.2018 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: skat foundation
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005955112, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
skat foundation, in St. Gallen, CHE-109.988.738, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 107 vom 06.06.2023, Publ. 1005761704).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sanchez Erb, Yvette, von Rebstein, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung];
Güpfert, Andrea, von Wattwil, in Winterthur, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1005761704, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
skat foundation, in St. Gallen, CHE-109.988.738, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 130 vom 08.07.2021, Publ. 1005244203).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Häberli-Koller, Brigitta, genannt Brigitte, von Münchenbuchsee, in Bichelsee (Bichelsee-Balterswil), Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Sanchez Erb, Yvette, von Rebstein, in St. Gallen, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Publication number: HR02-1005244203, Commercial Registry Office St. Gallen, (320)
skat foundation, in St. Gallen, CHE-109.988.738, Stiftung (SHAB Nr. 23 vom 03.02.2021, Publ. 1005090830).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Wiederkehr, Frank, von Dietikon, in Winterthur, Mitglied des Stiftungsrates, ohne Zeichnungsberechtigung.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Saladin, Matthias, von Grellingen, in Winterthur, stellvertretender Geschäftsführer (Nichtmitglied), mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.