Reports for SK-Seal AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SK-Seal AG
- SK-Seal AG has its legal headquarters in Uetendorf, is active and operates in the sector «Manufacturing of electronic components».
- The company was founded on 13.03.1989.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 10.11.2023.
- The company is registered in the commercial register of the Canton of BE under the UID CHE-107.878.317.
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
13.03.1989
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Uetendorf
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.001.841-3
UID/VAT
CHE-107.878.317
Sector
Manufacturing of electronic components
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Handel mit und Fabrikation von technischen Produkten, insbesondere von mechanischen und elektronischen Komponenten, Geräten und Anlagen, sowie der Handel und die Verarbeitung von Abdichtungselementen, Abdichtungsmaterialien und anderen Baustoffen. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften im In- und Ausland errichten, sich an anderen Unternehmen im In- und Ausland beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmen erwerben oder sich mit solchen zusammenschliessen, Grundstücke erwerben, verwalten und veräussern sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern, oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen. Sie kann auch Finanzierungen für eigene oder fremde Rechnung vornehmen sowie Garantien und Bürgschaften für Tochtergesellschaften und Dritte eingehen.
Auditor
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Trevision Treuhand und Revision AG | Reiden | 02.07.2004 | 16.11.2008 | |
Bruno Lanz, Buchhaltungen, Revisionen, Steuern | Bern | <2004 | 01.07.2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Dreyer Apparatebau AG
- Elektronik Bauteile Dreyer R. Apparatebau AG
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SK-Seal AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005881775, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SK-Seal AG, in Thierachern, CHE-107.878.317, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 139 vom 20.07.2023, Publ. 1005799972).
Statutenänderung:
02.11.2023.
Sitz neu:
Uetendorf.
Domizil neu:
Thunstrasse 41, 3661 Uetendorf.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Keller, Stefan, von Konolfingen, in Längenbühl (Forst-Längenbühl), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Siegrist, Yasmine Helena, von Hilterfingen, in Längenbühl (Forst-Längenbühl), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005799972, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SK-Seal AG, in Thierachern, CHE-107.878.317, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 70 vom 12.04.2023, Publ. 1005721413).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Scheidegger, Ulrich, von Trub, in Schwarzenegg (Unterlangenegg), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Scheidegger, Marc, von Trub, in Thierachern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Keller, Stefan, von Konolfingen, in Längenbühl (Forst-Längenbühl), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien].
Publication number: HR02-1005721413, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SK-Seal AG, in Thierachern, CHE-107.878.317, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 103 vom 29.05.2019, Publ. 1004640515).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Scheidegger, Ulrich, von Trub, in Schwarzenegg (Unterlangenegg), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Keller, Stefan, von Konolfingen, in Längenbühl (Forst-Längenbühl), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien;
Scheidegger, Marc, von Trub, in Thierachern, Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.