Reports for SIEGENIA-AUBI AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SIEGENIA-AUBI AG
- SIEGENIA-AUBI AG in Uetendorf is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Trading with various goods». SIEGENIA-AUBI AG is active.
- The management of the company SIEGENIA-AUBI AG, which was founded on the 25.03.1977, consists of 4 persons.
- On the 27.05.2021 the commercial register entry of the company was last changed. Under «Notifications» you will find all changes.
- The reported UID is the following: CHE-101.633.935.
Management (4)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Martin Portner,
Roy Blumenstein,
Alfons Bichsel,
Wieland Frank
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
25.03.1977
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Uetendorf
Commercial Registry Office
BE
Commercial register number
CH-092.3.007.676-8
UID/VAT
CHE-101.633.935
Sector
Trading with various goods
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Die Gesellschaft bezweckt die Herstellung und den Vertrieb von Baubeschlägen, die Verwertung von Patenten und Schutzrechten sowie den Erwerb von Grundstücken. Die Gesellschaft kann Zweigniederlassungen errichten, sich an andern Unternehmungen beteiligen, gleichartige oder verwandte Unternehmungen erwerben oder errichten sowie alle Geschäfte eingehen und Verträge abschliessen, die geeignet sind, den Zweck der Gesellschaft zu fördern oder die direkt oder indirekt damit im Zusammenhang stehen.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
unico thun ag | Thun | 20.11.2009 |
Former auditor (2)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Niklaus Liechti Treuhand | Frutigen | 28.02.2008 | 19.11.2009 | |
Spahn Treuhand | Sigriswil | <2004 | 27.02.2008 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SIEGENIA-AUBI AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005193813, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SIEGENIA-AUBI AG, in Uetendorf, CHE-101.633.935, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 89 vom 08.05.2020, Publ. 1004885392).
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Portner, Martin, von Uebeschi, in Strengelbach, Delegierter des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien [bisher: Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien];
Blumenstein, Roy, von Niederbipp, in Brittnau, Geschäftsführer, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: HR02-1004885392, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SIEGENIA-AUBI AG, in Uetendorf, CHE-101.633.935, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 119 vom 24.06.2014, S.0, Publ. 1570621).
Statutenänderung:
28.04.2020.
Aktien neu:
750 Namenaktien zu CHF 1'000.00 [bisher: 750 Inhaberaktien zu CHF 1'000.00].
Publikationsorgan neu:
SHAB und Amtsblatt des Kantons Bern.
Mitteilungen neu:
Mitteilungen an die Aktionäre: per Brief oder E-Mail.
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Tschanz, Reinhard, von Sigriswil, in Merligen (Sigriswil), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Frank, Wieland, deutscher Staatsangehöriger, in Wilnsdorf-Obersdorf (DE), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift [bisher: Präsident, mit Einzelunterschrift];
Bichsel, Alfons, von Hasle bei Burgdorf, in Merligen (Sigriswil), Mitglied des Verwaltungsrates, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Publication number: 1570621, Commercial Registry Office Berne, (36)
SIEGENIA-AUBI AG, in Uetendorf, CHE-101.633.935, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 168 vom 31.08.2011, Publ. 6316308).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Eltz, Renatus, von Madiswil, in Merligen (Sigriswil), Mitglied, mit Kollektivunterschrift zu zweien.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
unico thun ag (CHE-107.680.927), in Thun, Revisionsstelle [bisher: unico thun ag (CH-092.3.001.054-6)].
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.