Reports for SICK AG
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SICK AG
- SICK AG with its legal headquarters in Stans is active. SICK AG operates in the sector «Trading with machines».
- The management of the company SICK AG consists of 6 persons.
- Under «Notifications» you can see all modifications to the commercial register entry. The most recent modification was on 23.11.2022.
- The company is registered in the commercial register NW under the UID CHE-107.925.678.
- There are 6 other active companies that have registered an identical address. These include: Infanger Propeller AG, M.A.H. INTERNATIONAL AG, ROOMDESIGN Eveline Renggli.
Management (6)
newest board members
newest authorized signatories
Massimo Maria Azzerri,
Alan John Reeves,
Heinz Bieri,
Siegfried Habermacher,
Claudio Masoch
Executive board
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
19.12.1979
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Stans
Commercial Registry Office
NW
Commercial register number
CH-150.3.000.500-0
UID/VAT
CHE-107.925.678
Sector
Trading with machines
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Zweck der Gesellschaft ist die Entwicklung, die Herstellung und der Vertrieb optisch-elektronischer Geräte. Die Gesellschaft kann im In- und Ausland Zweigniederlassungen und Tochtergesellschaften errichten und sich an anderen Unternehmungen beteiligen. Die Gesellschaft ist berechtigt, im In- und Ausland Grundeigentum zu erwerben, zu belasten, zu veräussern und zu verwalten. Die Gesellschaft kann Darlehen an direkte oder indirekte Anteilsinhaber sowie an Unternehmen der Gesellschafts-Gruppe (d.h. Tochter- und Beteiligungsgesellschaften an der SICK AG, Waldkirch i.Br., Deutschland) gewähren sowie Garantien oder Bürgschaften aller Art für Verbindlichkeiten gegenüber Gesellschaften der Gesellschafts-Gruppe ausrichten. Die Gesellschaft kann an Cash-Pooling-Operationen innerhalb der Gesellschafts-Gruppe teilnehmen. Die Gesellschaft kann im übrigen alle Geschäfte tätigen, die geeignet sind, die Entwicklung des Unternehmens und die Erreichung des Gesellschaftszwecks zu fördern.
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Ernst & Young AG | Zug | <2004 |
Other company names
Past and translated company names
- Sick Erwin AG Optik-Elektronik
Ownership structure
Holdings
Newest SOGC notifications: SICK AG
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005610848, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
SICK AG, in Stans, CHE-107.925.678, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 170 vom 02.09.2022, Publ. 1005553190).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Rdzanek, Wlodzimierz Piotr, polnischer Staatsangehöriger, in Lomianki (PL), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Azzerri, Massimo Maria, italienischer Staatsangehöriger, in Genua (IT), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005553190, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
SICK AG, in Stans, CHE-107.925.678, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 65 vom 06.04.2021, Publ. 1005140842).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Cervera Amblar, Josep Maria, spanischer Staatsangehöriger, in Barcelona (ES), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Eingetragene Personen neu oder mutierend:
Rdzanek, Wlodzimierz Piotr, polnischer Staatsangehöriger, in Lomianki (PL), Präsident des Verwaltungsrates, mit Einzelunterschrift.
Publication number: HR02-1005140842, Commercial Registry Office Nidwalden, (150)
SICK AG, in Stans, CHE-107.925.678, Aktiengesellschaft (SHAB Nr. 162 vom 21.08.2020, Publ. 1004962324).
Ausgeschiedene Personen und erloschene Unterschriften:
Stadelmann, Iso, von Kriens, in Oberkirch, mit Kollektivprokura zu zweien.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.