Reports for SICHH Swiss Integrative Center for Human Health SA
Credit rating information
Evaluation of credit rating with traffic light as risk indicator and other helpful data about the company. Find out moreEconomic information
Comprehensive information about the economic situation of a company. Find out morePayment collection information
Overview of current and past debt enforcement proceedings. Find out moreShareholder Information
Find out which national and international companies the stock corporation you are interested in also holds shares in. Find out moreCompany dossier as PDF
Contact information, changes in the company, turnover and employee figures, management, ownership, shareholding structure and other company data. Retrieve company dossierAbout SICHH Swiss Integrative Center for Human Health SA
- SICHH Swiss Integrative Center for Human Health SA in Fribourg is a Company limited by shares (AG) from the sector «Research and development». SICHH Swiss Integrative Center for Human Health SA is active.
- The company was founded on 24.07.2013.
- The last commercial register change was made on 30.06.2023. All changes can be viewed under the section «Notifications» and saved as a PDF.
- The reported UID is CHE-167.337.427.
- company SICHH Swiss Integrative Center for Human Health SA has 3 active trademarks, cancelled trademarks or pending applications.
Management (4)
newest board members
Diego Bravar,
Francesco Menegoni,
Julien Frédéric Franck Rousset,
Robert Slooves
newest authorized signatories
Diego Bravar,
Francesco Menegoni,
Julien Frédéric Franck Rousset,
Robert Slooves
Commercial register information
Entry in the commercial register
24.07.2013
Legal form
Company limited by shares (AG)
Legal headquarters of the company
Fribourg
Commercial Registry Office
FR
Commercial register number
CH-217.3.553.370-1
UID/VAT
CHE-167.337.427
Sector
Research and development
Purpose (Original language) Customise the company purpose with just a few clicks.
Exploitation d'un centre de compétences et promotion de la recherche, du développement industriel et de la collaboration avec les hautes écoles et les instituts de recherche dans les sciences du vivant (cf. statuts pour but secondaire modifié).
Auditor
Current auditor (1)
Name | City | Since | Until | |
---|---|---|---|---|
Fidutrust Revision SA | Fribourg | 29.07.2013 |
Other company names
Es sind keine früheren oder übersetzten Firmannamen vorhanden.
Would you like to update the company name? Click here.Ownership structure
Holdings
Trademarks
Trademark | Registration date | Status | Number |
---|---|---|---|
13.09.2021 | active | 14486/2020 | |
12.07.2017 | active | 53295/2017 |
Newest SOGC notifications: SICHH Swiss Integrative Center for Human Health SA
The latest updates from the Swiss Official Gazette of Commerce (SOGC) are available in the original language of the source commercial register office only. View all notifications
Publication number: HR02-1005782982, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
SICHH Swiss Integrative Center for Human Health SA, à Fribourg, CHE-167.337.427 (FOSC du 09.09.2022, p. 0/1005558430).
Personne radiée:
Alberi Lavinia, directrice, signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005558430, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
SICHH Swiss Integrative Center for Human Health SA, à Fribourg, CHE-167.337.427 (FOSC du 16.02.2022, p. 0/1005406958).
Personnes radiées:
Fromm Giese Katharina Margarethe, administratrice, présidente, signature collective à deux;
Jenny René, administrateur, signature collective à deux;
Loser Giovanni, administrateur, signature collective à deux;
Vauthey Widmer Barbara Maria, administratrice, signature collective à deux.
Personne inscrite modifiée:
Bravar Diego, administrateur, signature collective à deux, désormais administrateur, président, signature collective à deux.
Nouvelles personnes inscrites:
Menegoni Francesco, d'Italie, à Trieste (IT), administrateur, signature collective à deux;
Rousset Julien Frédéric Franck, de et à Fribourg, administrateur, signature collective à deux;
Slooves Robert Henri, des Pays-Bas, à Plan-les-Ouates, administrateur, signature collective à deux.
Publication number: HR02-1005406958, Commercial Registry Office Fribourg, (217)
SICHH Swiss Integrative Center for Human Health SA, à Fribourg, CHE-167.337.427 (FOSC du 04.06.2021, p. 0/1005206954).
Personne radiée:
Brunner Jean-Marc, administrateur, directeur, signature collective à deux.
Nouvelles personnes inscrites:
Bravar Diego, d'Italie, à Trieste (IT), administrateur, signature collective à deux;
Loser Giovanni, d'Italie, à Milano (IT), administrateur, signature collective à deux;
Alberi Lavinia, d'Italie, à La Tour-de-Peilz, directrice, signature collective à deux.
Hit list
Here you will find a link from the management to a hit list of persons with the same name who are registered in the commercial register.